This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 08/14/2023 at 16:06:13 (UTC).

Rexel USA, Inc. vs. Imperial Electric Service

Case Summary

On 05/16/2023 Rexel USA, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Imperial Electric Service. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno County BF Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Culver Kapetan, Kristi and Mangano, Robert. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1865

  • Filing Date:

    05/16/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Culver Kapetan, Kristi

Mangano, Robert

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Plaintiffs

Rexel USA, Inc.

Platt Electric Supply

Imperial Electric Service

Rexel USA,, Inc.

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

Imperial Electric Service

Hudson Insurance Company

Cross Defendants and Defendants

Hudson Insurance Company

a Delaware Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

Stoker, Steven R.

Cross Defendant and Defendant Attorney

Cameron, Clark H.

 

Court Documents

5-16-23 Civil Case Cover Sheet

05/16/2023: 5-16-23 Civil Case Cover Sheet

5-16-23 Complaint

05/16/2023: 5-16-23 Complaint

5-22-23 Summons

05/22/2023: 5-22-23 Summons

5-22-23 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes

05/22/2023: 5-22-23 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes

Answer.pdf

06/22/2023: Answer.pdf

6-22-23 Cross-Complaint

06/22/2023: 6-22-23 Cross-Complaint

6-30-23 Summons Cross-Complaint

06/30/2023: 6-30-23 Summons Cross-Complaint

6/30/23 Rexel's Answer to First Cross-Complaint

06/30/2023: 6/30/23 Rexel's Answer to First Cross-Complaint

06/30/23 Proof of Service of Summons

06/30/2023: 06/30/23 Proof of Service of Summons

6-30-23 Proof of Service

06/30/2023: 6-30-23 Proof of Service

7-20-23 Proof of Service of summons and complaint re: Imperial Electric Service

07/20/2023: 7-20-23 Proof of Service of summons and complaint re: Imperial Electric Service

7-25-23 Request to Enter Default Denied

07/25/2023: 7-25-23 Request to Enter Default Denied

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Mangano, Robert; Hearing Time: 3:30 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default Denied; Comment: Defective proof of service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2023
  • DocketSummons and Complaint; Unserved; Comment: DEFECTIVE Reason : proof of service by mail is required pursuant to CCP 415.95

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for Hudson Insurance Company: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2023-43357 Hudson Insurance Company $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for Hudson Insurance Company: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2023
  • FinancialFinancial: Hudson Insurance Company; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2023
  • DocketSummons and Complaint; Unserved; Comment: Defective re: no date of mailing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2023
  • DocketSummons and Complaint; Served: 06/14/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 06/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed; Comment: on Cross-Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCross Complaint Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for Rexel USA, Inc.: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2023-34419 Rexel USA, Inc. $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for Rexel USA, Inc.: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • FinancialFinancial: Rexel USA, Inc.; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Filed; Comment: Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purpose (emailed)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less