This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 11/18/2023 at 01:02:33 (UTC).

Jonathan Lin vs. Honsu, Inc.

Case Summary

On 07/17/2023 Jonathan Lin filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Honsu, Inc. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno County BF Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Mangano, Robert and Tharpe, D Tyler. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2889

  • Filing Date:

    07/17/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Mangano, Robert

Tharpe, D Tyler

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lin, Jonathan

Defendants

Honsu, Inc.

Mountain Motorsports

Synchrony Bank

Polaris Industries, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Bonakdar, Roger S.

Defendant Attorney

Critchlow, Evan J.

 

Court Documents

7-17-23 Civil Case Cover Sheet

07/17/2023: 7-17-23 Civil Case Cover Sheet

7-17-23 Complaint

07/17/2023: 7-17-23 Complaint

7-25-23 Summons Issued and Filed

07/25/2023: 7-25-23 Summons Issued and Filed

7-26-23 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes

07/26/2023: 7-26-23 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes

9/11/23 Polaris' Answer

09/11/2023: 9/11/23 Polaris' Answer

10/9/23 Honsu's Answer

10/09/2023: 10/9/23 Honsu's Answer

10/10/2023 - Answer

10/10/2023: 10/10/2023 - Answer

Case Management Statement

11/01/2023: Case Management Statement

11/01/23 Case Management Statement - HRG 11/16/23

11/01/2023: 11/01/23 Case Management Statement - HRG 11/16/23

 

Docket Entries

11/16/2023

DocketCase Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Mangano, Robert; Hearing Time: 3:30 PM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/01/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCase Management Statement Filed; Comment: Case Management Statement

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/01/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCase Management Statement Filed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/23/2023

FinancialFinancial info for Synchrony Bank: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2023-73628 Synchrony Bank $435.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/23/2023

FinancialFinancial info for Synchrony Bank: Transaction Assessment $435.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/23/2023

FinancialFinancial: Synchrony Bank; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/12/2023

FinancialFinancial info for Honsu, Inc.: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2023-71302 Honsu, Inc. $435.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/12/2023

FinancialFinancial info for Honsu, Inc.: Transaction Assessment $435.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/12/2023

FinancialFinancial: Honsu, Inc.; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/10/2023
View Court Documents

DocketAnswer Filed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
09/13/2023

FinancialFinancial info for Polaris Industries, Inc.: Transaction Assessment $435.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2023

FinancialFinancial: Polaris Industries, Inc.; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/11/2023
View Court Documents

DocketAnswer Filed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/26/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice Filed; Comment: of CMC and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes. (emailed)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/25/2023

FinancialFinancial info for Lin, Jonathan: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2023-49269 Lin, Jonathan $435.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/25/2023

FinancialFinancial info for Lin, Jonathan: Transaction Assessment $435.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/25/2023

FinancialFinancial: Lin, Jonathan; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSummons issued and filed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/17/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCivil Complaint filed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/17/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCivil case cover sheet

[+] Read More [-] Read Less