This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 06/15/2023 at 16:20:57 (UTC).

Marx Ford vs Aaron Harden

Case Summary

On 03/17/2023 Marx Ford filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Aaron Harden. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno County BF Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Skiles, Jon M and Mangano, Robert. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1013

  • Filing Date:

    03/17/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Skiles, Jon M

Mangano, Robert

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ford, Marx

Defendant

Harden, Aaron Stuart

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Stirrup, Adam B.

Defendant Attorney

Buttry, William G

 

Court Documents

3-17-23 Civil Case Cover Sheet

03/17/2023: 3-17-23 Civil Case Cover Sheet

3-17-23 Complaint

03/17/2023: 3-17-23 Complaint

3-20-23 Summons

03/20/2023: 3-20-23 Summons

3-20-23 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes

03/20/2023: 3-20-23 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes

3/20/23 Plaintiff's Deposit/Payment of Jury Fees

03/20/2023: 3/20/23 Plaintiff's Deposit/Payment of Jury Fees

3/22/2023 Proof of Service

03/22/2023: 3/22/2023 Proof of Service

4/20/23 - Answer

04/20/2023: 4/20/23 - Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Mangano, Robert; Hearing Time: 3:30 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for Harden, Aaron Stuart: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2023-27347 Harden, Aaron Stuart $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for Harden, Aaron Stuart: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2023
  • FinancialFinancial: Harden, Aaron Stuart; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • DocketSummons and Complaint; Served: 03/22/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for Ford, Marx: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2023-19375 Ford, Marx $150.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for Ford, Marx: Transaction Assessment $150.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for Ford, Marx: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2023-19047 Ford, Marx $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for Ford, Marx: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • FinancialFinancial: Ford, Marx; Total Financial Assessment $585.00; Total Payments and Credits $585.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Filed; Comment: Plaintiff's Deposit/Payment of Jury Fees Pursuant to CCP 631(b)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Filed; Comment: Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purpose (emailed)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less