This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 08/14/2023 at 16:17:17 (UTC).

Nicole Zamora vs David Ochoa

Case Summary

On 05/16/2023 Nicole Zamora filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against David Ochoa. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno County BF Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Skiles, Jon M and Mangano, Robert. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1843

  • Filing Date:

    05/16/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Skiles, Jon M

Mangano, Robert

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Zamora, Nicole

Defendants and Cross Defendants

Ochoa, David

Moreno, Arturo

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

Moreno, Arturo

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Stirrup, Adam B.

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorney

Garabedian, Kristina D.

 

Court Documents

5/16/2023 Civil Case Cover Sheet

05/16/2023: 5/16/2023 Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/16/2023 Complaint

05/16/2023: 5/16/2023 Complaint

5/18/2023 Summons

05/18/2023: 5/18/2023 Summons

5/18/2023 CV-48A Notice of Case Mgmnt Conf and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes w/CM

05/18/2023: 5/18/2023 CV-48A Notice of Case Mgmnt Conf and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes w/CM

5-22-23 Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint re: David Ochoa

05/22/2023: 5-22-23 Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint re: David Ochoa

5/23/23 - Notice of Jury Deposit

05/23/2023: 5/23/23 - Notice of Jury Deposit

5/24/23 - Proof of Service

05/24/2023: 5/24/23 - Proof of Service

7-14-23 Answer

07/14/2023: 7-14-23 Answer

7-14-23 Notice of Posting Advance Jury Fees

07/14/2023: 7-14-23 Notice of Posting Advance Jury Fees

7-14-23 First Cross-Complaint

07/14/2023: 7-14-23 First Cross-Complaint

7/31/2023 Request for Dismissal of Party

07/31/2023: 7/31/2023 Request for Dismissal of Party

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/20/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Mangano, Robert; Hearing Time: 3:30 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2023
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party; Name: Ochoa, David; Comment: without prejudice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal Received - Pending Review; Comment: without prejudice; as to Defendant David Ochoa only in complaint.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for Ochoa, David: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2023-48904 Ochoa, David $585.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for Ochoa, David: Transaction Assessment $585.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2023
  • FinancialFinancial: Ochoa, David; Total Financial Assessment $585.00; Total Payments and Credits $585.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCross Complaint Filed; Comment: 1st Cross-Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Filed; Comment: Notice of Posting Advance Jury Fees

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for Zamora, Nicole: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2023-35948 Zamora, Nicole $150.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 05/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Filed; Comment: Deposit/Payment of Jury Fees Pursuant to CCP 631(b)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • DocketSummons and Complaint; Served: 05/22/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for Zamora, Nicole: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2023-33810 Zamora, Nicole $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for Zamora, Nicole: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • FinancialFinancial: Zamora, Nicole; Total Financial Assessment $585.00; Total Payments and Credits $585.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Comment: CMC and CJAP set for 9/20/2023 at 3:30pm in dept 402

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less