This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 07/22/2023 at 12:23:00 (UTC).

Progressive Direct Insurance Company vs. Erick Guzman

Case Summary

On 05/23/2023 Progressive Direct Insurance Company filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Erick Guzman. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno County BF Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Mangano, Robert. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4362

  • Filing Date:

    05/23/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Mangano, Robert

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Progressive Direct Insurance Company

Defendant

Guzman, Erick

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Nivinskus, Mark R

 

Court Documents

05/23/2023 Complaint

05/23/2023: 05/23/2023 Complaint

05/23/2023 Civil Case Cover Sheet

05/23/2023: 05/23/2023 Civil Case Cover Sheet

05/23/2023 Statement of Damages

05/23/2023: 05/23/2023 Statement of Damages

05/26/2023 Summons

05/26/2023: 05/26/2023 Summons

05/26/2023 Notice of Case Management Conference

05/26/2023: 05/26/2023 Notice of Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/19/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Mangano, Robert; Hearing Time: 3:30 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for Progressive Direct Insurance Company: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2023-35497 Progressive Direct Insurance Company $225.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for Progressive Direct Insurance Company: Transaction Assessment $225.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • FinancialFinancial: Progressive Direct Insurance Company; Total Financial Assessment $225.00; Total Payments and Credits $225.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Comment: CMC 9/19/2023 3:30 p.m. Dept. 402

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement filed; Comment: Re: Damages

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less