This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 02/07/2020 at 18:08:22 (UTC).

Carrie Reed vs Stephen Reed

Case Summary

On 11/18/2019 Carrie Reed filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Stephen Reed. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Mangano, Robert and Kalemkarian, David. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6601

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Mangano, Robert

Kalemkarian, David

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Reed, Carrie N

Respondent

Reed, Stephen M

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2020
  • Docket1 Family - Centered Status Conference- Judicial Officer: Kalemkarian, David; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketDocuments sent to- Comment: FLEX for judgment review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default- Comment: As to Stephen Reed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketDocuments sent to- Comment: Default Box. Default/Judgment/Envelopes.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for Reed, Carrie N: Counter Payment Receipt # FAM-2019-00012985 Reed, Carrie N $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for Reed, Carrie N: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • FinancialFinancial: Reed, Carrie N; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketSummons issued and filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution without Children- Comment: Summons issued yes

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.