This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/20/2023 at 17:19:07 (UTC).

The Carolyn and Mario De Francesco March 1991 Trust dated March 14, 1991

Case Summary

On 05/25/2022 The Carolyn and Mario De Francesco March 1991 Trust dated March 14, 1991 was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno County BF Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Arax, Brian M. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0620

  • Filing Date:

    05/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Arax, Brian M

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Cardella, Michelle

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Laird, Scott D.

Vote, Steven K.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketNotice Filed; Comment: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketContinued Hearing by Court; Judicial Officer: Arax, Brian M; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissed; Comment: Petition for Orders (1) Regarding Validity of Trust and for Cancellation of Grant Deeds; and (2) Imposing Damages Pursuant to Probate Code Section 859

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire Case); Comment: "Dismissal entered as requested" (cc emailed)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketPetition; Judicial Officer: Arax, Brian M; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued Party's Motion; Comment: Petition for Orders (1) Regarding Validity of Trust and for Cancellation of Grant Deeds; and (2) Imposing Damages Pursuant to Probate Code Section 859

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Cardella, Michelle: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2022-31870 Cardella, Michelle $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Cardella, Michelle: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: Cardella, Michelle; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketTrust Petition (Initial); Comment: Petition for Orders (1) Regarding Validity of Trust and for Cancellation of Grant Deeds; and (2) Imposing Damages Pursuant to Probate Code Section 859

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less