This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 02/09/2022 at 15:06:36 (UTC).

California Department of Transportation vs Sylvia Rodriguez

Case Summary

On 01/12/2022 California Department of Transportation filed an Other lawsuit against Sylvia Rodriguez. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Cullers, Mark. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0102

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Cullers, Mark

 

Party Details

Petitioner

California Department of Transportation

Respondent

Rodriguez, Sylvia

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Coonley, Phillip

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketShow Cause Regard Harassment; Judicial Officer: Cullers, Mark; Hearing Time: 8:32 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • DocketAmended Document Filed; Comment: Declaration and Additional Evidence in Support of Request to Modify Workplace Violence Restraining Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • DocketProof of Service; Comment: on Respondent Sylvia Rodriguez

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • DocketNotice Filed; Comment: Notice of Errata to Declaration and Additional Evidence

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketProof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketNotice of Hearing and TRO; Judicial Officer: Cullers, Mark; Comment: Temporary Restraining Order Granted. Date: 3/28/22 Time: 8:30 AM Dept: 404

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketOrder Received for Signature; Comment: Forwarded to Dept: 404 Order for: Notice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketOrder Received for Signature; Comment: Forwarded to Dept: 404 Order for: TRO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketDeclaration Filed; Comment: of Petitioner and Additional Evidence

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketPetition for Injunction prohibiting harassment of employees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketChambers Work- Pre; Judicial Officer: Cullers, Mark; Hearing Time: 5:30 PM; Result: Chambers Work - Order Submitted for Consideration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketChambers Work- Pre; Judicial Officer: Cullers, Mark; Hearing Time: 5:30 PM; Result: Chambers Work - Order Submitted for Consideration

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION is a litigant