This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/24/2023 at 12:00:09 (UTC).

Bullfrog Swim School vs. Karra Williams

Case Summary

On 09/21/2022 Bullfrog Swim School filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Karra Williams. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno County BF Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Tharpe, D Tyler, Negin, Stephanie, Whalen, Robert and Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2989

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Tharpe, D Tyler

Negin, Stephanie

Whalen, Robert

Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.

 

Party Details

Cross Plaintiff and Plaintiff

Bullfrog Swim School

Cross Defendant and Defendant

Williams, Karra

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Weber, Barry E.

Cross Defendant and Defendant Attorney

Vote, Steven K.

 

Court Documents

9/21/2022-Civil Case Cover Sheet

09/21/2022: 9/21/2022-Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/21/2022-Complaint

09/21/2022: 9/21/2022-Complaint

9/21/2022-Summons

09/21/2022: 9/21/2022-Summons

1-30-23 Proof of Electronic Service re: Notice of Motion

01/30/2023: 1-30-23 Proof of Electronic Service re: Notice of Motion

1-30-23 Notice of Motion and Motion to Set Aside Default; MP&A and Declaration - HRG 7/11/23

01/30/2023: 1-30-23 Notice of Motion and Motion to Set Aside Default; MP&A and Declaration - HRG 7/11/23

Notice

01/25/2023: Notice

1-19-23 Request for Entry of Default

01/19/2023: 1-19-23 Request for Entry of Default

Defendant's Notice of Deposit of Jury Fees

01/19/2023: Defendant's Notice of Deposit of Jury Fees

1/19/23-Minute Order Attachment

01/19/2023: 1/19/23-Minute Order Attachment

1/11/2023-Order Regarding Remote Appearance Granted

01/11/2023: 1/11/2023-Order Regarding Remote Appearance Granted

Stipulation

01/06/2023: Stipulation

1st Amend CMC state.pdf

01/06/2023: 1st Amend CMC state.pdf

Notice of Remote Appearance

01/05/2023: Notice of Remote Appearance

Case Management Statement

01/05/2023: Case Management Statement

Proof Of Electronic Service Williams.docx.pdf

01/03/2023: Proof Of Electronic Service Williams.docx.pdf

Case Management Statement Karra Williams.docx.pdf

01/03/2023: Case Management Statement Karra Williams.docx.pdf

12-2-22 First Cross-Complaint

12/02/2022: 12-2-22 First Cross-Complaint

12-2-22 Verified Answer to Complaint

12/02/2022: 12-2-22 Verified Answer to Complaint

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2024
  • DocketJury Trial; Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2024
  • DocketTrial Readiness; Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2024
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2023
  • DocketMotion - Set Aside Default; Judicial Officer: Tharpe, D Tyler; Hearing Time: 3:27 PM; Comment: Barry Weber

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for Bullfrog Swim School: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2023-06847 Bullfrog Swim School $60.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for Bullfrog Swim School: Transaction Assessment $60.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service; Comment: Proof of Electronic Service re: Notice of Motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Motion; Comment: Notice of Motion and Motion to Set Aside Default; Memorandum of Points and Authorities and Declaration of Attorney

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Filed; Comment: Notice of Entry of Default

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for Williams, Karra: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2023-04999 Williams, Karra $150.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 10/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit; Comment: Due Diligence

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service; Comment: by Mail

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Comment: Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes (Emailed)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Bullfrog Swim School: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2022-59630 Bullfrog Swim School $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Bullfrog Swim School: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: Bullfrog Swim School; Total Financial Assessment $495.00; Total Payments and Credits $495.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less