This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 04/13/2022 at 08:25:14 (UTC).

Brianne Glick vs. City of Clovis

Case Summary

On 01/09/2019 Brianne Glick filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against City of Clovis. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Gaab, Kimberly, Tharpe, D Tyler, Black, Donald, Simpson, Alan, McGuire, Rosemary and Brickey, Gabriel. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0122

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Gaab, Kimberly

Tharpe, D Tyler

Black, Donald

Simpson, Alan

McGuire, Rosemary

Brickey, Gabriel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Plaintiff

Glick, Brianne

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

UCP Barday III LLC

Benchmark Communities LLC

Fresno Metropolitan Flood Control District

City of Clovis

UCP Barclay III, LLC

Glick, Brianne

UCP Barclay, III, LLC

UCP, LLC

Houston Casualty Company, a Coporation

Defendant and Cross Defendant

City of Clovis

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Cuttone, Brian K.

Wanger, Oliver W.

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

Tuttle, Christopher Franklin

Nguyen, Darrell V

O'Neal, Jeffrey F.

Walls, Chester E

Cross Plaintiff Attorney

Olivieri, Denae M.

 

Court Documents

Request Filed

Petition Court.pdf; Comment: for Continuance of Motion to Strike and Demurrer

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment; Comment: in chambers MO

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment; Comment: Demurrer/Motion to Strike with clerk's certificate of mailing

Notice Filed

Notice Filed; Comment: Notice of Assignment of Judge for all Purposes

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing; Comment: Plesae Note: Department Change

Case Management Statement Filed

FMFCD's CMC Statement.pdf

Reply filed

Reply; Comment: Defendant City of Clovis's Reply of Non-Opposition to Demurrer to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint

Notice of Hearing

Civil Document; Comment: rescheduled hearing to 7/24/2020 at 1:30 pm in Dept. 402

Order Received for Signature

Proposed Order; Comment: *Pending Hearing [Proposed] Order on Demurrer to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint

12-20-21 Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

12/20/2021: 12-20-21 Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

49316Requestf000017a

11/08/2021: 49316Requestf000017a

Civil Document

10/28/2021: Civil Document

Minute Order Attachment

08/18/2021: Minute Order Attachment

Case Management Statement

08/12/2021: Case Management Statement

CV-31 Notice of Dismissal Hearing Pursuant to Rule 3.3185

05/07/2021: CV-31 Notice of Dismissal Hearing Pursuant to Rule 3.3185

CV-31 Notice of Dismissal Hearing Pursuant to Rule 3.3185

05/07/2021: CV-31 Notice of Dismissal Hearing Pursuant to Rule 3.3185

CV-31 Notice of Dismissal Hearing Pursuant to Rule 3.3185

05/07/2021: CV-31 Notice of Dismissal Hearing Pursuant to Rule 3.3185

CV-31 Notice of Dismissal Hearing Pursuant to Rule 3.3185

05/07/2021: CV-31 Notice of Dismissal Hearing Pursuant to Rule 3.3185

289 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2022
  • DocketCRC 3.1385 After Settlement; Judicial Officer: Brickey, Gabriel; Hearing Time: 3:31 PM; Cancel Reason: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judgment Type: Request for Dismissal filed; Comment; Comment: (as to Cross-Complaint (entire action is now dismissed)); Party; Names: UCP Barclay, III, LLC; UCP, LLC; Houston Casualty Company, a Coporation; Benchmark Communities LLC; Glick, Brianne; City of Clovis; Fresno Metropolitan Flood Control District; Benchmark Communities LLC; UCP Barclay III, LLC; City of Clovis; Glick, Brianne; Comment: with prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal Received - Pending Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Comment: Notice of Rescheduled Dismissal Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order Attachment; Comment: from chambers

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketChambers Work- Pre; Original Type: Chambers Work- Pre; Judicial Officer: Brickey, Gabriel; Hearing Time: 5:30 PM; Result: Chambers Work - Order Submitted for Consideration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Gaab, Kimberly; Hearing Time: 3:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Settled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Comment: Notice of Dismissal Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
263 More Docket Entries
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Filed; Comment: Case reassigned to Judge Donald S. Black

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Filed; Comment: Notice of Errata to Complaint to Correct Misspelling of UCP Barclay III, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for Glick, Brianne: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2019-02612 Glick, Brianne $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for Glick, Brianne: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • FinancialFinancial: Glick, Brianne; Total Financial Assessment $845.00; Total Payments and Credits $845.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Comment: of case management conference hearing and assignment of judge for all purposes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/01/1900
  • DocketChambers Work- Pre; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Benchmark Communities LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Fresno Metropolitan Flood Control District is a litigant

Latest cases where Houston Casualty Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Cuttone, Brian K.