This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 01/21/2020 at 12:52:17 (UTC).

Brent Hirata vs. Eloisa Ruiz

Case Summary

On 06/27/2019 Brent Hirata filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Eloisa Ruiz. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1415

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Hirata, Brent

Defendant

Ruiz, Eloisa Ramos

 

Court Documents

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Plaintiff's Claim filed

Plaintiff's Claim filed

Judgment

SC-130 Notice of Entry of Judgment; Judicial Officer: Judge, Pro Tempore; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To:; Hirata, Brent; Awarded Against:; Ruiz, Eloisa Ramos; Amount; Damages: $8,944.71; Costs: $75.00; Total: $9019.71; Comment: Statement of Decision: Plaintiff is awarded $5,500.00 as the estimated cost of repairs; plus $728.00 for towing and storage; plus $235.40 in transportation costs; plus $1,341.90 for personal injury medical/dental bills; plus $500.00in past lost wages; and plus $639.41 in general damages. Plaintiff established through testimony and witness declarations that Defendant was the legal/pronimate cause of MVA.; Party Names: Hirata, Brent; Ruiz, Eloisa Ramos

Satisfaction of Judgment in Full filed

Satisfaction of Judgment in Full filed

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment- SC-130 Notice of Entry of Judgment; Judicial Officer: Judge, Pro Tempore; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To:; Hirata, Brent; Awarded Against:; Ruiz, Eloisa Ramos; Amount; Damages: $8,944.71; Costs: $75.00; Total: $9019.71; Comment: Statement of Decision: Plaintiff is awarded $5,500.00 as the estimated cost of repairs; plus $728.00 for towing and storage; plus $235.40 in transportation costs; plus $1,341.90 for personal injury medical/dental bills; plus $500.00in past lost wages; and plus $639.41 in general damages. Plaintiff established through testimony and witness declarations that Defendant was the legal/pronimate cause of MVA.; Party Names: Hirata, Brent; Ruiz, Eloisa Ramos

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingSatisfaction of Judgment in Full filed- Satisfaction of Judgment in Full filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • HearingNotice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingMinute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • HearingTaken under advisement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • HearingCourt Trial- Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard; Parties Present- Plaintiff: Hirata, Brent; Parties Present- Defendant: Ruiz, Eloisa Ramos

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • HearingPlaintiff's Claim and Order SC- Comment: Fee:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingProof of Service- Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • HearingCause Of Action- Action Plaintiff's Claim ; File Date: 06/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingPlaintiff's Claim filed- Plaintiff's Claim filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for Hirata, Brent: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2019-00007807 Hirata, Brent $75.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for Hirata, Brent: Transaction Assessment $75.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • FinancialFinancial: Hirata, Brent; Total Financial Assessment $75.00; Total Payments and Credits $75.00

    Read MoreRead Less