This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 12/05/2019 at 19:51:25 (UTC).

Brenda Williams vs Dwight Adams

Case Summary

On 06/27/2019 a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce case was filed by Brenda Williams against Dwight Adams in the jurisdiction of Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3634

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kalemkarian, David

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Willaims, Brenda

Williams, Brenda

Respondent

Adams, Dwight

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/06/2019
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Final Judgment; Party Name: Williams, Brenda; Comment: Default Judgment/marital status ends 01/06/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • Hearing1 Family - Centered Status Conference- Judicial Officer: Kalemkarian, David; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • HearingNotice of Entry of Judgment- Comment: Default Judgment/marital status ends 01/06/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • HearingDeclaration for Default or Uncontested Disso or Legal Sep

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • HearingDeclaration regarding Service of Declaration of Disclosure- Comment: Preliminary and Final

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • HearingRequest to Enter Default- Comment: entered as to respondent Dwight Adams

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • HearingProof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • HearingSummons issued and filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • HearingPetition for Dissolution without Children

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for Williams, Brenda: Fee Waiver $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for Williams, Brenda: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • FinancialFinancial: Williams, Brenda; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less