This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 09/28/2022 at 16:09:34 (UTC).

Breckenridge Property Fund 2016, LLC vs. Reginald Kerney

Case Summary

On 06/30/2022 Breckenridge Property Fund 2016, LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Reginald Kerney. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno County BF Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Cabrera, Carlos and Cullers, Mark. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4244

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Cabrera, Carlos

Cullers, Mark

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Breckenridge Property Fund 2016, LLC

Defendant

Kerney, Reginald

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Chandra, Sam

 

Court Documents

6/30/22 Civil Case Cover Sheet

06/30/2022: 6/30/22 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Unlawful Detainer Complaint Filed

06/30/2022: Unlawful Detainer Complaint Filed

6/30/22 Unlawful Detainer Supplemental Cover Sheet

06/30/2022: 6/30/22 Unlawful Detainer Supplemental Cover Sheet

7/5/22 Summons

07/05/2022: 7/5/22 Summons

CV-15 Notice of Dismissal Hearing

07/05/2022: CV-15 Notice of Dismissal Hearing

CV-56 Notice of Restricted Access

07/05/2022: CV-56 Notice of Restricted Access

CV-56 Notice of Restricted Access

07/05/2022: CV-56 Notice of Restricted Access

Order Received for Signature

07/14/2022: Order Received for Signature

08/02/22 Request for Dismissal of Does

08/02/2022: 08/02/22 Request for Dismissal of Does

08/02/22 Request for Entry of Default

08/02/2022: 08/02/22 Request for Entry of Default

08/02/22 Request for Clerk's Judgment Granted

08/02/2022: 08/02/22 Request for Clerk's Judgment Granted

08/02/22 Proof of Service

08/02/2022: 08/02/22 Proof of Service

08/02/22 Proof of Service

08/02/2022: 08/02/22 Proof of Service

08/10/2022 - Writ of Possession Issued

08/10/2022: 08/10/2022 - Writ of Possession Issued

08/31/22 Return filed

08/31/2022: 08/31/22 Return filed

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn filed; Comment: Return of Writ Filed Satisified As To Possession

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketUnlawful Detainer Dismissal; Judicial Officer: Cullers, Mark; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Breckenridge Property Fund 2016, LLC: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2022-49004 Breckenridge Property Fund 2016, LLC $40.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Breckenridge Property Fund 2016, LLC: Transaction Assessment $40.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Possession Issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judgment Type: Restitution of Premises Judgment; Party; Names: Breckenridge Property Fund 2016, LLC; Kerney, Reginald; Unlawful Detainer; Awarded To; Breckenridge Property Fund 2016, LLC; Entitled to Possession of Premises at; 3310 Alps Lane Clovis CA 93619; Judgment Applies to All Occupants; Awarded Against; Kerney, Reginald

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • DocketProof of Service of Prejudgment Claim of Right to Possession; Served: 07/15/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • DocketSummons and Complaint; Served: 07/15/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketApplication for Publication/Posting Order filed; Judicial Officer: Cabrera, Carlos; Comment: Type of Document: Order to Post GRANTED as to Reginald Kerney; all occupants

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Breckenridge Property Fund 2016, LLC: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2022-40463 Breckenridge Property Fund 2016, LLC $240.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Breckenridge Property Fund 2016, LLC: Transaction Assessment $240.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: Breckenridge Property Fund 2016, LLC; Total Financial Assessment $300.00; Total Payments and Credits $300.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Mailing; Comment: I certify that I am not a party to this cause and a true copy of the (Notice of Restricted Access) was placed in a sealed envelope and placed for collection and mailing on the date and at the place shown below following our ordinary business practice. I am readily familiar with this court's practice for collection and processing correspondence for mailing. On the same day that correspondence is placed for collection and mailing, it is deposited in the ordinary course of business with the United States Postal Service with postage fully prepaid. Place of Mailing: Fresno, California on (7/5/22) . Parties served: (Reginald Kerney; All Occupants)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Comment: UDDI set for 8/30/22 at 8:30am in D404

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUnlawful Detainer Supplemental Cover Sheet; Comment: Non-Rent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUnlawful Detainer Complaint filed; Comment: 1161a

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BRECKENRIDGE PROPERTY FUND 2016, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHANDRA, SAM