This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 07/22/2022 at 12:25:10 (UTC).

Breanna Trevino vs. Compassionate Care Home Health Agency, LLC

Case Summary

On 05/23/2022 Breanna Trevino filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Compassionate Care Home Health Agency, LLC. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Gaab, Kimberly and Negin, Stephanie. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1571

  • Filing Date:

    05/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Gaab, Kimberly

Negin, Stephanie

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Trevino, Breanna

Defendants

Compassionate Care Home Health Agency, LLC

a California Limited Liability Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Carlson, Wesley

 

Court Documents

5/23/22 Complaint

05/23/2022: 5/23/22 Complaint

5/23/22 Civil Case Cover Sheet

05/23/2022: 5/23/22 Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/24/22 CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes

05/24/2022: 5/24/22 CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes

5/24/22 Summons

05/24/2022: 5/24/22 Summons

6/9/22 Proof of Service

06/09/2022: 6/9/22 Proof of Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Negin, Stephanie; Hearing Time: 3:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketSummons and Complaint; Served: 06/08/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Trevino, Breanna: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2022-31651 TREVINO, BREANNA $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Trevino, Breanna: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: Trevino, Breanna; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Comment: of CMC and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where a California Limited Liability Company is a litigant