This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 09/16/2021 at 22:19:52 (UTC).

Brandon Sanchez vs James Lewis

Case Summary

On 02/23/2021 Brandon Sanchez filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against James Lewis. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are McGuire, Rosemary, Brickey, Gabriel and Gaab, Kimberly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0534

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

McGuire, Rosemary

Brickey, Gabriel

Gaab, Kimberly

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Sanchez, Brandon

Aluisi, Jaclyn

Defendants

Lewis, Cassondra

Lewis, James

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

May, Garrett

Defendant Attorney

Walsh, Daniel C.

 

Court Documents

ADR Stipulation Mediation filed

Stipulation; Comment: Parties to engage in mediation. Mediator: Laurie Saldana

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Notice Filed

Notice of Jury Deposit; Comment: Notice of Posting Jury Fees

Case Management Statement Filed

Case Management Statement; Comment: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement Filed

Case Management Statement

Notice of Motion

Motion; Comment: and Motion to: Strike Portions of Plaintiffs' Complaint; Declaration of Dhave Balatero

Order Received for Signature

Proposed Order; Comment: (Pending Hearing) Order Granting Motion to Strike Portions of Plaintiffs' Complaint

Request for Judical Notice

Notice; Comment: ISO Defendant's Motion to Strike Portions of Plaintiff's Complaint

Answer Filed

Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance Fee

Notice of Hearing

CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes; Comment: CMC set for 6/30/21 in Dept. 402 at 3:30pm. Assignment of Judge for all purposes.

Summons issued and filed

Summons

Civil Complaint filed

Complaint

Civil case cover sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2023
  • DocketJury Trial- Judicial Officer: Gaab, Kimberly; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: Estimated 7-10 days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • DocketTrial Readiness- Judicial Officer: Gaab, Kimberly; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference- Hearing Time: 1:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketMotion - Strike- Judicial Officer: McGuire, Rosemary; Hearing Time: 3:27 PM; Comment: Dhave Balatero

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketOSC - ADR Stipulation- Judicial Officer: Brickey, Gabriel; Hearing Time: 3:32 PM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADR Stipulation Mediation filed- Stipulation; Comment: Parties to engage in mediation. Mediator: Laurie Saldana

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketReferral to ADR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketJury Trial Requested by Both Parties- Comment: Estimated 7-10 days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference- Judicial Officer: Brickey, Gabriel; Hearing Time: 3:30 PM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Received for Signature- Proposed Order; Comment: (Pending Hearing) Order Granting Motion to Strike Portions of Plaintiffs' Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Judical Notice- Notice; Comment: ISO Defendant's Motion to Strike Portions of Plaintiff's Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer Filed- Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Sanchez, Brandon: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2021-10242 Sanchez, Brandon $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Sanchez, Brandon: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: Sanchez, Brandon; Total Financial Assessment $585.00; Total Payments and Credits $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing- CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes; Comment: CMC set for 6/30/21 in Dept. 402 at 3:30pm. Assignment of Judge for all purposes.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed- Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed- Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet- Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DANIEL C. WALSH