This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 19:43:16 (UTC).

Blanca Estela Hernandez Cruz vs Juan Macin Cruz

Case Summary

On 06/27/2019 a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce case was filed by Blanca Estela Hernandez Cruz against Juan Macin Cruz in the jurisdiction of Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3648

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Kalemkarian, David

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Hernandez Cruz, Blanca Estela

Respondent

Cruz, Juan Macin

Minors

Macin Hernandez, Eduardo

Macin Hernandez, Juan Ignacio

Macin Hernandez, Esperanza

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2020
  • 1 Family - Centered Status Conference- Judicial Officer: Kalemkarian, David; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • Documents sent to- Comment: Default Desk for Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • Proof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • Income and Expense Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • Uniform Child Custody Jurisdiction Act

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • Summons issued and filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • Petition for Dissolution with Children

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • Financial info for Hernandez Cruz, Blanca Estela: Fee Waiver $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • Financial info for Hernandez Cruz, Blanca Estela: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • Financial: Hernandez Cruz, Blanca Estela; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less