This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 04/21/2022 at 04:28:20 (UTC).

BETA Healthcare Group vs Gisela Lopez-Smith

Case Summary

On 05/19/2020 BETA Healthcare Group filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Gisela Lopez-Smith. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno County BF Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Tharpe, D Tyler. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1497

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Tharpe, D Tyler

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BETA Healthcare Group

Defendants

Fajardo-Ochoa, Roberto

Lopez-Smith, Gisela Guadalupe

Sapna Farms, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Duncan, Brian L.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Hearing

Civil Document; Comment: *Time Change*

Notice Filed

Notice Filed; Comment: Notice of Assignment of Judge for all Purposes

Civil case cover sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Summons issued and filed

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Summons issued and filed

Civil Complaint filed

Complaint

Request for Dismissal

10/13/2020: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order Attachment

10/06/2020: Minute Order Attachment

Case Management Statement

09/17/2020: Case Management Statement

Civil Document

07/15/2020: Civil Document

Notice Filed

06/15/2020: Notice Filed

Summons

05/20/2020: Summons

Summons

05/20/2020: Summons

Complaint

05/19/2020: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

05/19/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Pre; Judicial Officer: Tharpe, D Tyler; Hearing Time: 1:32 PM; Cancel Reason: Dismissed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal Received - Pending Review

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judgment Type: Request for Dismissal filed; Party; Names: Lopez-Smith, Gisela Guadalupe; BETA Healthcare Group; Sapna Farms, LLC; Fajardo-Ochoa, Roberto; Comment: without prejudice.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order Attachment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Tharpe, D Tyler; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement Filed; Comment: by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Comment: *Time Change*

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Filed; Comment: Notice of Assignment of Judge for all Purposes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for BETA Healthcare Group: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2020-36370 BETA Healthcare Group $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for BETA Healthcare Group: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • FinancialFinancial: BETA Healthcare Group; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/01/1900
  • DocketChambers Work- Pre; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less