This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 04/20/2020 at 12:53:00 (UTC).

Beneficial State Bank vs. Priscilla Tongsay

Case Summary

On 06/27/2019 Beneficial State Bank filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Priscilla Tongsay. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Pebet, Noelle and Dalesandro, Samuel. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6290

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Pebet, Noelle

Dalesandro, Samuel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Beneficial State Bank

Defendants

Tongsay, Priscilla Phay

Tonhsay, Lucky

Tongsay, Priscilla

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Silver, Steven A.

 

Court Documents

Judgment

Default Judgment by Court; Judicial Officer: Pebet, Noelle; Judgment Type: Default Judgment by Court; Party Names: Beneficial State Bank; Tongsay, Priscilla; Tonhsay, Lucky; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To:; Beneficial State Bank; Awarded Against:; Tongsay, Priscilla; Tonhsay, Lucky; Amount; Damages: $5,517.87; Pre-Judgment Interest Rate: 14.32 %; Pre-Judgment Interest: $26.94; Attorney Fees: $1,077.68; Costs: $623.50; Total: $7245.99

Declaration Filed

Declaration; Comment: Declaration in Support of Default Judgment

Judgment Received

Request for Court Judgment; Comment: Forward to: Dept 404 on 9/19/2019

Dismissal of Doe Defendant(s)

Request for Dismissal of Does and Roes; Comment: Without Prejudice Does: 1-10

Request to Enter Default

Request for Entry of Default

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Declaration Filed

Declaration; Comment: Non-Service of Summons & Complaint as to Priscilla Tongsay aka Priscilla Phay Tongsay

Declaration Filed

PONS_eABC_Proof_47122627.pdf; Comment: RE: NON SERVICE

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Summons issued and filed

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Summons issued and filed

Civil case cover sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Complaint filed

Complaint

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment- Default Judgment by Court; Judicial Officer: Pebet, Noelle; Judgment Type: Default Judgment by Court; Party Names: Beneficial State Bank; Tongsay, Priscilla; Tonhsay, Lucky; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To:; Beneficial State Bank; Awarded Against:; Tongsay, Priscilla; Tonhsay, Lucky; Amount; Damages: $5,517.87; Pre-Judgment Interest Rate: 14.32 %; Pre-Judgment Interest: $26.94; Attorney Fees: $1,077.68; Costs: $623.50; Total: $7245.99

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketChambers Work- Pre- Judicial Officer: Dalesandro, Samuel; Hearing Time: 5:30 PM; Result: Chambers Work - Order Submitted for Consideration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration Filed- Declaration; Comment: Declaration in Support of Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment Received- Request for Court Judgment; Comment: Forward to: Dept 404 on 9/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDismissal of Doe Defendant(s)- Request for Dismissal of Does and Roes; Comment: Without Prejudice Does: 1-10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default- Request for Entry of Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for Tongsay, Priscilla: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2019-00009368 Tongsay, Priscilla $0.40

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for Tongsay, Priscilla: Transaction Assessment $0.40

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • FinancialFinancial: Tongsay, Priscilla; Total Financial Assessment $0.40; Total Payments and Credits $0.40

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • DocketSummons and Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 07/15/2019
  • DocketSummons and Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service- Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration Filed- Declaration; Comment: Non-Service of Summons & Complaint as to Priscilla Tongsay aka Priscilla Phay Tongsay

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration Filed- PONS_eABC_Proof_47122627.pdf; Comment: RE: NON SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for Beneficial State Bank: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2019-50387 Beneficial State Bank $370.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for Beneficial State Bank: Transaction Assessment $370.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • FinancialFinancial: Beneficial State Bank; Total Financial Assessment $370.00; Total Payments and Credits $370.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed- Summons; Summons issued and filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet- Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed- Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less