This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 09/16/2019 at 13:01:11 (UTC).

Beneficial State Bank vs. Katelyn Larson

Case Summary

On 06/27/2019 a Contract - Debt Collection case was filed by Beneficial State Bank against Katelyn Larson in the jurisdiction of Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6259

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Beneficial State Bank

Defendants

Katelyn Marie Larson

Larson, Katelyn M.

 

Court Documents

Declaration Filed

PONS_eABC_Proof_51083361.pdf; Comment: Declaration of Non-Service KATELYN M. LARSON AKA KATELYN MARIE LARSON

Declaration Filed

Declaration; Comment: Non-Service of Summons & Complaint as to Katelyn M Larson aka Katelyn Marie Larson

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Summons issued and filed

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Summons issued and filed

Statement filed

Statement of Classification and Location/Venue; Comment: Re: Venue

Civil case cover sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Complaint filed

Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration Filed- PONS_eABC_Proof_51083361.pdf; Comment: Declaration of Non-Service KATELYN M. LARSON AKA KATELYN MARIE LARSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration Filed- Declaration; Comment: Non-Service of Summons & Complaint as to Katelyn M Larson aka Katelyn Marie Larson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed- Summons; Summons issued and filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Statement filed- Statement of Classification and Location/Venue; Comment: Re: Venue

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil case cover sheet- Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Complaint filed- Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • Financial info for Beneficial State Bank: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2019-50404 Beneficial State Bank $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • Financial info for Beneficial State Bank: Transaction Assessment $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • Financial: Beneficial State Bank; Total Financial Assessment $225.00; Total Payments and Credits $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less