This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/22/2023 at 05:21:21 (UTC).

Baxter, Bailey, & Associates vs. Eastside Transportation, LLC., A California Limited Liability Company

Case Summary

On 07/07/2022 Baxter, Bailey, Associates filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Eastside Transportation, LLC , A California Limited Liability Company. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno County BF Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4537

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Baxter, Bailey, & Associates

Defendants

Eastside Transportation, LLC., A California Limited Liability Company

Double D J Farms

L7J Vanderham Farming, LLC ., A California Limited Liability Company

Harris Feeding Company., A California Corporation

Trinkler Dairy Farms, INC., A California Corporation

New Way Trucking LTD, A Canada Limited Liability Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Grant, Richard L

 

Court Documents

7/7/2022 Civil Case Cover Sheet

07/07/2022: 7/7/2022 Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/7/2022 Complaint

07/07/2022: 7/7/2022 Complaint

7/12/2022 Summons

07/11/2022: 7/12/2022 Summons

11/30/2022 - Request for Dismissal

11/30/2022: 11/30/2022 - Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judgment Type: Request for Dismissal filed; Party; Names: Baxter, Bailey, & Associates; Eastside Transportation, LLC., A California Limited Liability Company; L7J Vanderham Farming, LLC ., A California Limited Liability Company; Harris Feeding Company., A California Corporation; Trinkler Dairy Farms, INC., A California Corporation; New Way Trucking LTD, A Canada Limited Liability Company; Comment: With Prejudice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal Received - Pending Review

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Baxter, Bailey, & Associates: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2022-42159 Baxter, Bailey, & Associates $370.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Baxter, Bailey, & Associates: Transaction Assessment $370.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: Baxter, Bailey, & Associates; Total Financial Assessment $370.00; Total Payments and Credits $370.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less