This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/22/2023 at 05:20:56 (UTC).

Baxter, Bailey, & Associates, Inc. vs. Walmart Inc.

Case Summary

On 07/07/2022 Baxter, Bailey, Associates, Inc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Walmart Inc. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno County BF Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4538

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Baxter, Bailey, & Associates, Inc.

Defendants

Walmart Inc.

USA Broker Freight Solutions Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Grant, Richard L

 

Court Documents

7/7/2022 - Cover Sheet

07/07/2022: 7/7/2022 - Cover Sheet

7/7/2022 - Complaint

07/07/2022: 7/7/2022 - Complaint

7/12/2022 - Summons

07/12/2022: 7/12/2022 - Summons

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Baxter, Bailey, & Associates, Inc.: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2022-42181 Baxter, Bailey, & Associates, Inc. $225.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Baxter, Bailey, & Associates, Inc.: Transaction Assessment $225.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: Baxter, Bailey, & Associates, Inc.; Total Financial Assessment $225.00; Total Payments and Credits $225.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less