This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 10/02/2019 at 06:04:12 (UTC).

Barclays Bank Delaware vs. Andrew Salazar

Case Summary

On 06/27/2019 a Contract - Debt Collection case was filed by Barclays Bank Delaware against Andrew Salazar in the jurisdiction of Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6275

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Barclays Bank Delaware

Defendant

Salazar, Andrew

 

Court Documents

Judgment

Request for Dismissal filed; Judgment Type: Request for Dismissal filed; Party Names: Barclays Bank Delaware; Salazar, Andrew; Comment: With Prejudice

Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review

Request for Dismissal

Proof of Service

POS_eABC_BatchEfileProofsOfServiceAndMailing_47499515.pdf

Summons issued and filed

Suttell_661901_sum_eABC.pdf; Summons issued and filed

Summons issued and filed

Suttell_661901_sum_eABC.pdf; Summons issued and filed

Statement filed

Statement of Classification and Location/Venue; Comment: of Venue

Civil case cover sheet

Suttell_661901_ccs_eABC.pdf

Civil Complaint filed

Suttell_661901_com_eABC.pdf

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Request for Dismissal filed; Judgment Type: Request for Dismissal filed; Party Names: Barclays Bank Delaware; Salazar, Andrew; Comment: With Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review- Request for Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • Summons and Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service- POS_eABC_BatchEfileProofsOfServiceAndMailing_47499515.pdf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed- Suttell_661901_sum_eABC.pdf; Summons issued and filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Statement filed- Statement of Classification and Location/Venue; Comment: of Venue

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil case cover sheet- Suttell_661901_ccs_eABC.pdf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Complaint filed- Suttell_661901_com_eABC.pdf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • Financial info for Barclays Bank Delaware: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2019-50364 Barclays Bank Delaware $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • Financial info for Barclays Bank Delaware: Transaction Assessment $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • Financial: Barclays Bank Delaware; Total Financial Assessment $225.00; Total Payments and Credits $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less