This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 05/24/2020 at 03:03:33 (UTC).

Barbara Jean Anger (Estate)

Case Summary

On 06/21/2019 Barbara Jean Anger Estate was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kazanjian, Debra. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0591

  • Filing Date:

    06/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kazanjian, Debra

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Orndoff, Suzanne C.

Decedent

Anger, Barbara Jean

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Bagdasarian, Gary

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketProbate Status Hearing- Judicial Officer: Kazanjian, Debra; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar; Comment: Probate Status Hearing Status RE: Filing of the First or Final Account

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment- Comment: Notice of Entry of Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketOrder for Final Distribution- Judicial Officer: Kazanjian, Debra; Comment: Order Settling Waiver of Accounting and Report of Administrator with Will Annexed and Petition for its Settlement; for Allowance of Statutory Attorney's Fees and Administrator with Will Annexed's Compensation; for Extraordinary Attorney's Fees; for Costs Reimbursement, and for Final Distribution (cc emailed)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketPetition - Distribution- Judicial Officer: Kazanjian, Debra; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Granted; Comment: Waiver of Accounting and Report of Administrator with Will Annexed and Petition for its Settlement; for Allowance of Statutory Attorney's Fees and Administrator with Will Annexed's Compensation; for Extraordinary Attorney's Fees; for Costs Reimbursement, and for Final Distribution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • DocketDeclaration- Comment: Second Declaration in Support of Waiver of Accounting and Report of Administrator with Will Annexed and Petition for its Settlement; for Allowance of Statutory Attorney's Fees and Administrator with Will Annexed's Compensation; for Extraordinary Attorney's Fees; for Costs Reimbursement, and for Final Distribution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketNotice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketProbate Status Hearing- Judicial Officer: Kazanjian, Debra; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar; Comment: Probate Status Hearing Status RE: Filing of the Inventory and Appraisal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketDeclaration- Comment: Declaration of Gary G. Bagdasarian in Support of Request for Fees for Extraordinary Services

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketWaiver- Comment: Waiver of Accounting By Beneficiary /s/ Jonathan Anger

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketWaiver- Comment: Waiver of Accounting By Beneficiary /s/ Suzanne Orndoff

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 07/31/2019
  • DocketWill Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • DocketLetters (Estates)- Comment: cc emailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • DocketOrder for Probate- Judicial Officer: Kazanjian, Debra; Comment: cc emailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • DocketPetition - Probate- Judicial Officer: Kazanjian, Debra; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Granted; Comment: Petition for Probate of Will and for Letters of Administration with Will Annexed; Authorization to Administer Under the IAEA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • DocketProof of Publication- Comment: Declaration of Publication

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • DocketNotice of Petition to Administer Estate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • DocketConfidential Supplement to Duties and Liabilities

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • DocketDuties and Liabilities (Estates)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • DocketProof of Subscribing Witness- Comment: /s/ John H. Baker

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • DocketPetition for Probate (Initial)- Comment: Petition for Probate of Will and for Letters of Administration with Will Annexed; Authorization to Administer Under the IAEA no o's/l's

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.