This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 05/19/2020 at 12:12:12 (UTC).

Barbara Hix vs. Horacio Gutierrez

Case Summary

On 03/20/2020 Barbara Hix filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Horacio Gutierrez. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are McGuire, Rosemary and Tharpe, D Tyler. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1039

  • Filing Date:

    03/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

McGuire, Rosemary

Tharpe, D Tyler

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Hix, Barbara

Barbara Hix, Trustee of the John and Barbara Hix Living Trust

Defendants

Gutierrez, Horacio

Gutierrez, Yolanda

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Winter, Jody L.

 

Court Documents

Notice Filed

Notice; Comment: Notice of Errata

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing; Comment: Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for all Purposes

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Summons issued and filed

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Summons issued and filed

Civil Complaint filed

Complaint

Civil case cover sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketCase Management Conference- Judicial Officer: Tharpe, D Tyler; Hearing Time: 3:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Filed- Notice; Comment: Notice of Errata

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Barbara Hix, Trustee of the John and Barbara Hix Living Trust: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2020-23425 Barbara Hix, Trustee of the John and Barbara Hix Living Trust $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Barbara Hix, Trustee of the John and Barbara Hix Living Trust: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • FinancialFinancial: Barbara Hix, Trustee of the John and Barbara Hix Living Trust; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing- Notice of Hearing; Comment: Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for all Purposes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed- Summons; Summons issued and filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed- Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet- Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.