This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 11/27/2021 at 15:21:50 (UTC).

Badr Kawi vs Tyler Crumpler

Case Summary

On 07/28/2021 Badr Kawi filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Tyler Crumpler. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Gaab, Kimberly and Brickey, Gabriel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2171

  • Filing Date:

    07/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Gaab, Kimberly

Brickey, Gabriel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kawi, Badr

Defendants

Crumpler, Tyler

Crumpler, Kim

Crumpler, Mark

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kreit, Theodore

Defendant Attorney

Hitchcock, Kara L.

 

Court Documents

Civil case cover sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Complaint filed

Complaint

Summons issued and filed

Summons

Notice of Hearing

CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes; Comment: Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for all Purposes

Answer Filed

47604AnswerRe000bc5d

Case Management Statement Filed

Case Management Statement

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: of Electronic Service of Jury Deposit and Case Management Statement.

Notice Filed

Notice of Jury Deposit; Comment: of Jury Deposit

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference- Judicial Officer: Brickey, Gabriel; Hearing Time: 3:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Crumpler, Kim: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2021-73180 Crumpler, Kim $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Crumpler, Kim: Transaction Assessment $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketNotice Filed- Comment: of Jury Deposit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketADR Stipulation Mediation filed- Comment: Parties to engage in mediation. Mediator: Jim Dilling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Kawi, Badr: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2021-70824 Kawi, Badr $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Kawi, Badr: Transaction Assessment $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Filed- Notice of Jury Deposit; Comment: of Jury Deposit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service- Proof of Service; Comment: of Electronic Service of Jury Deposit and Case Management Statement.

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 09/27/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Crumpler, Tyler: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: Crumpler, Tyler; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer Filed- 47604AnswerRe000bc5d

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Kawi, Badr: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2021-47033 Kawi, Badr $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Kawi, Badr: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: Kawi, Badr; Total Financial Assessment $585.00; Total Payments and Credits $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing- CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes; Comment: Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for all Purposes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed- Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed- Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet- Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Hitchcock, Kara L.