This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/07/2020 at 16:05:05 (UTC).

Audeamus, Successor-in-interest by merger vs. JT2, Inc.

Case Summary

On 10/09/2019 Audeamus, Successor-in-interest by merger filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against JT2, Inc. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Tharpe, D Tyler and Simpson, Alan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3680

  • Filing Date:

    10/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Tharpe, D Tyler

Simpson, Alan

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Audeamus, Successor-in-interest by merger

to Kertel Communications, Inc. dba Sebastian, a California corporation

Defendants

Fowler Unified School District, a public entity

JT2, Inc. dba Todd Companies, a California corporation

Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland, a Maryland corporation

JT2, Inc.

Todd Companies, a California corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mann, Jerry H.

 

Court Documents

Notice Filed

Notice of Entry of Order; Comment: Notice of Entry of Order on Stipulation to Stay Litigation

Stipulation and Order filed

Stipulation and Order filed; Judicial Officer: Simpson, Alan; Comment: stipulation to stay litigation based on arbitration agreement

Order Received for Signature

Stipulation and Order; Comment: Signed and returned to clerk's office for further processing PENDING REVIEW Forwarded to Dept. 502 Order for : Stipulation to Stay Litigation based on Arbitration Agreement; and (Proposed] Order Thereon

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: Fidelity and Deposit Co.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: JT2, Inc.

Notice Filed

Notice Filed; Comment: Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes (emailed)

Notice Filed

Application/Request; Comment: Notice of Commencement of Stop Payment Notice Action

Civil Complaint filed

Complaint

Summons issued and filed

{{FilingCodeDescription}}; Summons issued and filed

Summons issued and filed

{{FilingCodeDescription}}; Summons issued and filed

Civil case cover sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketCase Management Conference- Judicial Officer: Tharpe, D Tyler; Hearing Time: 3:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Filed- Notice of Entry of Order; Comment: Notice of Entry of Order on Stipulation to Stay Litigation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland, a Maryland corporation: EFile Payment Receipt # ACCT-2019-03442 JT2, Inc. $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for JT2, Inc.: EFile Payment Receipt # ACCT-2019-03441 JT2, Inc. $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation and Order filed- Stipulation and Order filed; Judicial Officer: Simpson, Alan; Comment: stipulation to stay litigation based on arbitration agreement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for Fowler Unified School District, a public entity: Government Exemption Claimed $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for Fowler Unified School District, a public entity: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • FinancialFinancial: Fowler Unified School District, a public entity; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland, a Maryland corporation: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • FinancialFinancial: Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland, a Maryland corporation; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service- Proof of Service; Comment: Fidelity and Deposit Co.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service- Proof of Service; Comment: JT2, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Filed- Notice Filed; Comment: Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes (emailed)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for Audeamus, Successor-in-interest by merger: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2019-80545 AUDEAMUS, successor-in-interest to KERTEL COMMUNICATIONS, INC. dba SEBASTIAN $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for Audeamus, Successor-in-interest by merger: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • FinancialFinancial: Audeamus, Successor-in-interest by merger; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Filed- Application/Request; Comment: Notice of Commencement of Stop Payment Notice Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed- Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed- {{FilingCodeDescription}}; Summons issued and filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet- Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Todd A Govig is a litigant

Latest cases where FIDELITY AND DEPOSIT COMPANY OF MARYLAND is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mann, Jerry H.