This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 11/25/2021 at 12:56:42 (UTC).

Atkinson-Baker, Inc vs. Daniel Dawson

Case Summary

On 10/14/2020 Atkinson-Baker, Inc filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Daniel Dawson. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Cullers, Mark. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1350

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Cullers, Mark

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Atkinson-Baker, Inc

Defendants

Law Offices of Daniel W. Dawson

Dawson, Daniel W.

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff's Claim filed

Plaintiff's Claim filed

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Judgment

Request for Dismissal SC; Judgment Type: Request for Dismissal SC; Party Names: Atkinson-Baker, Inc; Dawson, Daniel W.; Law Offices of Daniel W. Dawson; Comment: With prejudice

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketCourt Trial- Judicial Officer: Cullers, Mark; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment- Request for Dismissal SC; Judgment Type: Request for Dismissal SC; Party Names: Atkinson-Baker, Inc; Dawson, Daniel W.; Law Offices of Daniel W. Dawson; Comment: With prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order SC- Comment: Fee: $40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order SC- Comment: Fee: $40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service- Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service- Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Atkinson-Baker, Inc: Mail Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2020-00004531 Atkinson-Baker, Inc $100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Atkinson-Baker, Inc: Transaction Assessment $100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • FinancialFinancial: Atkinson-Baker, Inc; Total Financial Assessment $100.00; Total Payments and Credits $100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketCause Of Action- Action Plaintiff's Claim ; File Date: 10/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim filed- Plaintiff's Claim filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ATKINSON-BAKER INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant