This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 02/20/2020 at 12:38:39 (UTC).

Arnold Webb vs. David Hovannisian & JDHov-Lp

Case Summary

On 06/27/2019 Arnold Webb filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against David Hovannisian JDHov-Lp. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Pebet, Noelle. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1418

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Pebet, Noelle

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Webb, Anita

Webb, Arnold

Defendant

David Hovannisian & JDHov-Lp

 

Court Documents

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment; Comment: attached with clerk's certificate of mailing

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Plaintiff's Claim filed

Plaintiff's Claim filed

Judgment

Small Claims Judgment - Contested; Judicial Officer: Pebet, Noelle; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested; Judgment - Non-Monetary Award; Awarded To:; David Hovannisian & JDHov-Lp; Awarded Against:; Webb, Arnold; Webb, Anita; Party Names: Webb, Arnold; Webb, Anita; David Hovannisian & JDHov-Lp

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of; Comment: Name: Brice Hovannisian, Property Manager

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment- Small Claims Judgment - Contested; Judicial Officer: Pebet, Noelle; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested; Judgment - Non-Monetary Award; Awarded To:; David Hovannisian & JDHov-Lp; Awarded Against:; Webb, Arnold; Webb, Anita; Party Names: Webb, Arnold; Webb, Anita; David Hovannisian & JDHov-Lp

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • DocketTaken Under Submission or Advisement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • DocketCourt Trial- Judicial Officer: Pebet, Noelle; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment; Comment: attached with clerk's certificate of mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of- Authorization to Appear on Behalf of; Comment: Name: Brice Hovannisian, Property Manager

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • DocketCourt Trial- Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Continued Party's Motion; Parties Present- Plaintiff: Webb, Arnold; Parties Present- Plaintiff: Webb, Anita; Parties Present- Defendant: David Hovannisian & JDHov-Lp

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order SC- Comment: Fee:$40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service- Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for Webb, Arnold: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2019-00007835 Webb, Arnold $57.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for Webb, Arnold: Transaction Assessment $7.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for Webb, Arnold: Transaction Assessment $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • FinancialFinancial: Webb, Arnold; Total Financial Assessment $57.50; Total Payments and Credits $57.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • DocketCause Of Action- Action Plaintiff's Claim ; File Date: 06/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim filed- Plaintiff's Claim filed

    Read MoreRead Less