Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 07/29/2020 at 20:26:07 (UTC).

Aralyn Tapia vs Mark Delgado

Case Summary

On 12/30/2019 Aralyn Tapia filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Mark Delgado. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Simpson, Alan, Tharpe, D Tyler and McGuire, Rosemary. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4647

  • Filing Date:

    12/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Simpson, Alan

Tharpe, D Tyler

McGuire, Rosemary

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Defendants

Delgado, Mark

Tapia, Aralyn

Defendants

reyes, Elvira

Delgado, Mark

Tapia, a minor, Aralyn

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

May, Garrett

Newman, Paul A.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Notice Filed

Notice of Jury Deposit; Comment: of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement Filed

Case Management Statement

Amended Document Filed

Amended Document Filed; Comment: Amended Answer to Complaint

Notice Filed

Notice Filed; Comment: Notice of Assignment of Judge for all Purposes

Notice of Hearing

Civil Document; Comment: rescheduled to 7/10/2020 at 1:30 pm in Dept. 402

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: Proof of Service

Answer Filed

Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance Fee

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Summons issued and filed

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Summons issued and filed

Order for Guardian Ad Litem Filed

Order for Guardian Ad Litem Filed; Judicial Officer: Simpson, Alan

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing; Comment: OF CASE MANAGEMENT AND ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGE FOR ALL PURPOSES

Application for Guardian Ad Litem Received

Application for Guardian Ad Litem Received

Civil Complaint filed

Complaint

Civil case cover sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketCase Management Conference- Judicial Officer: Tharpe, D Tyler; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketCase Management Conference- Judicial Officer: Tharpe, D Tyler; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Reyes, Elvira: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2020-47066 Reyes, Elvira $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Reyes, Elvira: Transaction Assessment $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Filed- Notice of Jury Deposit; Comment: of Jury Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement Filed- Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Tapia, Aralyn: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2020-46249 Tapia, Aralyn $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Tapia, Aralyn: Transaction Assessment $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketNotice Filed- Comment: jury fee deposit.

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder for Guardian Ad Litem Filed- Order for Guardian Ad Litem Filed; Judicial Officer: Simpson, Alan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing- Notice of Hearing; Comment: OF CASE MANAGEMENT AND ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGE FOR ALL PURPOSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketChambers Work- Pre- Judicial Officer: McGuire, Rosemary; Hearing Time: 5:30 PM; Result: Chambers Work - Order Submitted for Consideration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Tapia, Aralyn: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2020-00399 Tapia, a minor, Aralyn $495.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Tapia, Aralyn: Transaction Assessment $495.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • FinancialFinancial: Tapia, Aralyn; Total Financial Assessment $645.00; Total Payments and Credits $645.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication for Guardian Ad Litem Received- Application for Guardian Ad Litem Received; Comment: Signed and returned to clerk's office for further processing Forwarded (on 1/6/2020) to Dept: 502

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed- Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet- Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer May, Garrett David