This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 08/26/2019 at 12:12:22 (UTC).

Angel Lomeli vs Rosa Martinez

Case Summary

On 06/27/2019 a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle case was filed by Angel Lomeli against Rosa Martinez in the jurisdiction of Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2253

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

McGuire, Rosemary

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Lomeli, Angel

Heredia, Margarita

Defendants

Duarte, Ruby

Martinez, Rosa

 

Court Documents

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Summons issued and filed

Judgment

Request for Dismissal filed; Judgment Type: Request for Dismissal filed; Party Names: Lomeli, Angel; Heredia, Margarita; Martinez, Rosa; Duarte, Ruby; Comment: without prejudice

Civil Complaint filed

Complaint

Civil case cover sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice Filed

Notice of Jury Deposit; Comment: of Jury Deposit

Request for Refund Received - Pending Review

Request for Refund Received - Pending Review; Comment: Type of Refund: $435 + $150, filed in wrong County

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing; Comment: Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes

Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review

Request for Dismissal; Comment: Request for Dismissal

Summons issued and filed

Summons

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Request for Dismissal filed; Judgment Type: Request for Dismissal filed; Party Names: Lomeli, Angel; Heredia, Margarita; Martinez, Rosa; Duarte, Ruby; Comment: without prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • Case Management Conference- Judicial Officer: Tharpe, D Tyler; Hearing Time: 3:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Refund Received - Pending Review- Request for Refund Received - Pending Review; Comment: Type of Refund: $435 + $150, filed in wrong County

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review- Request for Dismissal; Comment: Request for Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice Filed- Notice of Jury Deposit; Comment: of Jury Deposit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing- Notice of Hearing; Comment: Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed- Summons; Summons issued and filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil case cover sheet- Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Complaint filed- Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less