This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 04/15/2022 at 09:30:14 (UTC).

Andrea Herington vs. Board of Trustees of California State University / COMPLEX / CLASS ACTION

Case Summary

On 04/30/2019 Andrea Herington filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Board of Trustees of California State University / COMPLEX / CLASS ACTION. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno County BF Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Hamilton, Jeffrey Y., Culver Kapetan, Kristi and Tharpe, D Tyler. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1465

  • Filing Date:

    04/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.

Culver Kapetan, Kristi

Tharpe, D Tyler

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Herington, Andrea

Ferrell, Barbara

Drew, Terri

Defendants

Board of Trustees of California State University

American Nurses Credentialing Center, Inc.

operating as California State University, Fresno

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ripamonti, Roberto G.

Defendant Attorneys

Baird, Courtney L.

Strella, Joseph W., JR

 

Court Documents

45719CaseMana00784ff

08/05/2021: 45719CaseMana00784ff

43167ProofofS019c217

05/25/2021: 43167ProofofS019c217

Minute Order Attachment

03/16/2021: Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

06/22/2021: Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

04/12/2022: Minute Order Attachment

3- Ripamonti Decl ISO Prelim App.pdf

11/09/2021: 3- Ripamonti Decl ISO Prelim App.pdf

POS.pdf

11/09/2021: POS.pdf

2-Memo ISO Prelim Approval (Final Draft).pdf

11/09/2021: 2-Memo ISO Prelim Approval (Final Draft).pdf

1-Notice.pdf

11/09/2021: 1-Notice.pdf

123 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketMotion - Prelim Approval Class Settlement; Judicial Officer: Culver Kapetan, Kristi; Hearing Time: 3:27 PM; Comment: Filed 11/9/21 - Roberto Ripamonti (cont. from 4/12/22)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order Attachment; Comment: & CM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • DocketMotion - Prelim Approval Class Settlement; Judicial Officer: Culver Kapetan, Kristi; Hearing Time: 3:27 PM; Result: Continued Court's Motion; Comment: Filed 11/9/21 ~ Roberto Ripamonti

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Herington, Andrea: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2021-71264 Herington, Andrea $60.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Herington, Andrea: Transaction Assessment $60.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service; Comment: by E-Mail of Notice of Motion; Declaration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration Filed; Comment: of Roberto Ripamonti ISO Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum of Points and Authorities; Comment: ISO Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Motion; Comment: and Motion and Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Culver Kapetan, Kristi; Hearing Time: 3:28 PM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
112 More Docket Entries
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration Filed; Comment: of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for Herington, Andrea: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2019-33863 Herington, Andrea $1435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for Herington, Andrea: Transaction Assessment $1435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • FinancialFinancial: Herington, Andrea; Total Financial Assessment $1,645.00; Total Payments and Credits $1,645.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Comment: CMC set for 9/4/19 at 3:30pm. Assignment of Judge for all purposes.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/01/1900
  • DocketChambers Work- Pre; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less