This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 10/07/2021 at 04:13:51 (UTC).

Ana Tran vs Quochuy Tran

Case Summary

On 03/17/2021 Ana Tran filed a Family - Marriage Annulment lawsuit against Quochuy Tran. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Kalemkarian, David and Hopper, Cindy. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1147

  • Filing Date:

    03/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Annulment

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Kalemkarian, David

Hopper, Cindy

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Tran, Ana Isabel

Respondent

Tran, Quochuy Nguyen

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Kharazi, Hadi-Ty S.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/01/2021
  • Docket1 Family - Centered Status Conference- Judicial Officer: Kalemkarian, David; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketNullity- Judicial Officer: Hopper, Cindy; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketMinute Order-Orders electronically mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketNullity- Judicial Officer: Hopper, Cindy; Hearing Time: 2:00 PM; Result: Continued Party's Motion; Comment: set by Ty Khazari

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default- Comment: as to Quochuy Tran

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketProposed Documents- Comment: Request to Enter Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Acknowledgment and Receipt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Tran, Ana Isabel: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2021-18186 Tran, Ana Isabel $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Tran, Ana Isabel: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: Tran, Ana Isabel; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketProperty Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketPetition Nullity without Children

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketSummons issued and filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KHARAZI, HADI-TY S