This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 11/19/2022 at 03:56:36 (UTC).

AMCO Insurance Company vs. Samuel Madriz Gonzalez

Case Summary

On 09/12/2022 AMCO Insurance Company filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Samuel Madriz Gonzalez. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno County BF Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Negin, Stephanie. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6397

  • Filing Date:

    09/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Negin, Stephanie

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMCO Insurance Company, an Iowa Corporation

Defendants

Gonzalez, Samuel Madriz

MadrizGonzalez, Samuel

PV Holding Corp, a Delaware Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Smith, Jay W.

 

Court Documents

9/12/2022 - Complaint

09/12/2022: 9/12/2022 - Complaint

9/12/2022 - Civil Case Cover Sheet

09/12/2022: 9/12/2022 - Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/16/2022 - Summons

09/16/2022: 9/16/2022 - Summons

9/16/2022 - CV-16 Notice of Case Management Conference

09/16/2022: 9/16/2022 - CV-16 Notice of Case Management Conference

Request for Dismissal of Party

09/19/2022: Request for Dismissal of Party

10/6/2022 - Proof of Service

10/06/2022: 10/6/2022 - Proof of Service

11/7/2022- Request For Entry of Default

11/07/2022: 11/7/2022- Request For Entry of Default

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Negin, Stephanie; Hearing Time: 3:30 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • DocketSummons and Complaint; Served: 09/29/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party; Name: PV Holding Corp, a Delaware Corporation; Comment: with prejudice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal Received - Pending Review

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for AMCO Insurance Company, an Iowa Corporation: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2022-57621 AMCO Insurance Company, an Iowa Corporation $370.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for AMCO Insurance Company, an Iowa Corporation: Transaction Assessment $370.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: AMCO Insurance Company, an Iowa Corporation; Total Financial Assessment $370.00; Total Payments and Credits $370.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Comment: CMC scheduled on 01/12/2023 at 3:30pm in Department 402

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PV HOLDING CORP. is a litigant

Latest cases where AMCO INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant