This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 08/07/2023 at 15:03:42 (UTC).

Alyssa Coghlan vs. Alex Raygoza, Jr.

Case Summary

On 12/09/2021 Alyssa Coghlan filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Alex Raygoza, Jr. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno County BF Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Negin, Stephanie, Mangano, Robert and Tharpe, D Tyler. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3637

  • Filing Date:

    12/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Negin, Stephanie

Mangano, Robert

Tharpe, D Tyler

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

as successor in interest to Samantha Axsom

Steiner, Thomas

Snyder, Mystic

Coghlan, Alyssa

Snyder, Dillion

Axsom, Samantha

by and through her successors-in interest

Defendants

Raygoza, Jr., Alex Eliseo

Estrada, Alonso

County of Fresno

City of Fresno

a public entity

Moreno, Michael

Celco Construction, Inc.

a California Corporation

Estrada, Alanzo

Cross Plaintiffs and Defendants

State of California

County of Fresno

City of Fresno

Moreno, Michael

Cross Defendant and Defendant

Estrada, Alanzo

12 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Teller, Jonathan C.

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

Piekut, Kevin

Boyd, Kurt

Ackeret, Peter

Severo, Michael V.

Other Attorneys

Bordin-Wosk, Joshua

 

Court Documents

12/06/22 Answer

12/06/2022: 12/06/22 Answer

Minute Order Attachment (Tentative Rulings Only)

11/30/2022: Minute Order Attachment (Tentative Rulings Only)

11-28-22 Request for Entry of Default of Michael Moreno (denied)

11/28/2022: 11-28-22 Request for Entry of Default of Michael Moreno (denied)

10/28/22 Declaration of Abrate re Dem / Mtn Strike HRG 11/3/22

10/28/2022: 10/28/22 Declaration of Abrate re Dem / Mtn Strike HRG 11/3/22

10/26/22 Proof of Service

10/26/2022: 10/26/22 Proof of Service

Minute Order Attachment

10/20/2022: Minute Order Attachment

10/18/2022-Amendment to Complaint Naming Doe 1

10/18/2022: 10/18/2022-Amendment to Complaint Naming Doe 1

Minute Order Attachment (Tentative Rulings Only)

10/13/2022: Minute Order Attachment (Tentative Rulings Only)

9/7/2022-Proof of Service (Defendant Michael Moreno)

09/07/2022: 9/7/2022-Proof of Service (Defendant Michael Moreno)

8-2-23 Order - Alanzo Estrada's Good Faith Settlement

08/02/2023: 8-2-23 Order - Alanzo Estrada's Good Faith Settlement

7-31-23 Order for Good Faith Settlement re: Alex Eliseo Raygoza Jr.

07/31/2023: 7-31-23 Order for Good Faith Settlement re: Alex Eliseo Raygoza Jr.

7/26/23 Proof of Service

07/26/2023: 7/26/23 Proof of Service

07/25/23 Proof of Service

07/25/2023: 07/25/23 Proof of Service

07/25/23 Proof of Service

07/25/2023: 07/25/23 Proof of Service

07/25/23 Proof of Service

07/25/2023: 07/25/23 Proof of Service

07/25/23 Proof of Service

07/25/2023: 07/25/23 Proof of Service

07/25/23 Proof of Service

07/25/2023: 07/25/23 Proof of Service

07/25/23 Proof of Service

07/25/2023: 07/25/23 Proof of Service

85 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/03/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Mangano, Robert; Hearing Time: 3:30 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder - Good Faith Settlement; Judicial Officer: Tharpe, D Tyler; Comment: Order determining good faith of settlement pursuant to CCP 877.6

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder - Good Faith Settlement; Judicial Officer: Tharpe, D Tyler; Comment: Order determining good faith of settlement pursuant to CCP 877.6

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service; Comment: Service of Application for Good Faith Settlement by Certified Mail

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service; Comment: by Certified Mail

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service; Comment: by Certified Mail

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service; Comment: by Certified Mail

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service; Comment: by Certified Mail

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service; Comment: by Certified Mail

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service; Comment: by Certified Mail

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
134 More Docket Entries
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketSummons and Complaint; Served: 01/25/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service; Comment: Statement of Damages

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Coghlan, Alyssa: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2021-77854 Cochlan, Alyssa $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Coghlan, Alyssa: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: Coghlan, Alyssa; Total Financial Assessment $585.00; Total Payments and Credits $585.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Comment: Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for all Purposes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less