This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 12/01/2021 at 20:34:07 (UTC).

Alvaro Saltos vs Rosa Juarez Mendoza

Case Summary

On 04/08/2021 Alvaro Saltos filed a Family - Marriage Annulment lawsuit against Rosa Juarez Mendoza. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kalemkarian, David. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1506

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Annulment

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kalemkarian, David

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Saltos, Alvaro D.

Respondent

Juarez Mendoza, Rosa Yalet

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Kharazi, Hadi-Ty S.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2021
  • Docket1 Family - Centered Status Conference- Judicial Officer: Kalemkarian, David; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketMinute Order-Orders electronically mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Juarez Mendoza, Rosa Yalet: EFile Payment Receipt # ACCT-2021-02451 Saltos; Alvaro; D. $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Juarez Mendoza, Rosa Yalet: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: Juarez Mendoza, Rosa Yalet; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Saltos, Alvaro D.: Fee Waiver $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Saltos, Alvaro D.: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: Saltos, Alvaro D.; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketJudge Kalemkarian Minute Order. See Attached

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketDeclaration regarding Service of Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketDeclaration Filed- Comment: Case Information - Family Law filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketNotice Filed- Comment: Request for Family Status Conference filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketProposed Documents- Comment: Accepted, pending review - Request for Status or Family Centered Case Resolution Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketAppearance Stipulation and Waiver

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketFamily Code Section 2105 Waiver

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketProperty Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketDeclaration regarding Service of Declaration of Disclosure- Comment: defective

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketProperty Declaration- Comment: Property Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketPetition Nullity without Children

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketFiled Complaint Issued Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KHARAZI, HADI-TY S