This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 01/05/2023 at 03:15:49 (UTC).

Alizeya Burciaga vs. Bulldog Lane Investments LLC

Case Summary

On 08/17/2022 Alizeya Burciaga filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Bulldog Lane Investments LLC. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno County BF Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Gaab, Kimberly and Negin, Stephanie. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2519

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Gaab, Kimberly

Negin, Stephanie

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Burciaga, Alizeya

Salazar, Shane

Defendants

Bulldog Lane Investments LLC

Imperial Sun Investment LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Elder, Margaret

Defendant Attorney

Hancock, Aaron

 

Court Documents

8/17/22 Complaint

08/17/2022: 8/17/22 Complaint

8/17/22 Summons

08/17/2022: 8/17/22 Summons

8/17/22 Civil Case Cover Sheet

08/17/2022: 8/17/22 Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/17/22 CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes

08/17/2022: 8/17/22 CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes

9/1/2022 Proof of Service

09/01/2022: 9/1/2022 Proof of Service

10/10/22 Answer

10/10/2022: 10/10/22 Answer

11/21/22 Notice

11/21/2022: 11/21/22 Notice

11/30/22 Case Management Statement

11/30/2022: 11/30/22 Case Management Statement

11/30/22 Notice of Jury Deposit

11/30/2022: 11/30/22 Notice of Jury Deposit

Minute Order Attachment

12/01/2022: Minute Order Attachment

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Negin, Stephanie; Hearing Time: 3:30 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Burciaga, Alizeya: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2022-74226 Burciaga, Alizeya $150.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Burciaga, Alizeya: Transaction Assessment $150.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order Attachment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketChambers Work- Pre; Judicial Officer: Negin, Stephanie; Hearing Time: 5:30 PM; Result: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Bulldog Lane Investments LLC: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2022-74069 Bulldog Lane Investments LLC $150.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Bulldog Lane Investments LLC: Transaction Assessment $150.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Filed; Comment: Notice of Posting Jury Fees

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement Filed; Comment: Plaintiff's Case Management Statement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketNotice Filed; Comment: NOTICE OF POSTING OF JURY FEE (Notices)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 10/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • DocketSummons and Complaint; Served: 08/30/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Burciaga, Alizeya: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2022-50800 Burciaga, Alizeya $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Burciaga, Alizeya: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: Burciaga, Alizeya; Total Financial Assessment $585.00; Total Payments and Credits $585.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Comment: of CMC and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HANCOCK, AARON