This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 07/01/2020 at 17:42:13 (UTC).

Alain Gerome vs. Bart Duren

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 Alain Gerome filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Bart Duren. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0016

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gerome, Alain R.

Defendant

Duren, Bart Gregory Dean

 

Court Documents

Judgment

SC-130 Notice of Entry of Judgment; Judicial Officer: Judge, Pro Tempore; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Uncontested; Judgment - Non-Monetary Award; Awarded To:; Duren, Bart Gregory Dean; Awarded Against:; Gerome, Alain R.; Status: Granted; Status Date: 02/20/2020; Status Comment: Defendant, Bart Gregory Dean Duren, waives DEFECTIVE service and chooses to proceed with the court hearing scheduled for today.; Comment: Statement of Decision: Defendant waives service.; Party Names: Gerome, Alain R.; Duren, Bart Gregory Dean

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Affidavit

Affidavit; Comment: Affidavit of Unsuccessful Service- Bart Gregory Dean Duren

Order Granting Waiver of Court Fees and Cost Signed

Order Granting Waiver of Court Fees and Cost Signed; Comment: By Clerk

Plaintiff's Claim filed

Plaintiff's Claim filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Gerome, Alain R.: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2020-00003142 Gerome, Alain R. $1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Gerome, Alain R.: Transaction Assessment $1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment- SC-130 Notice of Entry of Judgment; Judicial Officer: Judge, Pro Tempore; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Uncontested; Judgment - Non-Monetary Award; Awarded To:; Duren, Bart Gregory Dean; Awarded Against:; Gerome, Alain R.; Status: Granted; Status Date: 02/20/2020; Status Comment: Defendant, Bart Gregory Dean Duren, waives DEFECTIVE service and chooses to proceed with the court hearing scheduled for today.; Comment: Statement of Decision: Defendant waives service.; Party Names: Gerome, Alain R.; Duren, Bart Gregory Dean

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketCourt Trial- Hearing Time: 8:45 AM; Result: Heard; Parties Present- Defendant: Duren, Bart Gregory Dean

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Duren, Bart Gregory Dean: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2020-00000616 Duren, Bart Gregory Dean $3.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Duren, Bart Gregory Dean: Transaction Assessment $3.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • FinancialFinancial: Duren, Bart Gregory Dean; Total Financial Assessment $3.00; Total Payments and Credits $3.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order SC- Comment: Fee:$40.00/ Waiver

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit- Affidavit; Comment: Affidavit of Unsuccessful Service- Bart Gregory Dean Duren

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Gerome, Alain R.: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2020-00000161 Gerome, Alain R. $6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Gerome, Alain R.: Transaction Assessment $6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Gerome, Alain R.: Fee Waiver $77.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Gerome, Alain R.: Transaction Assessment $77.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • FinancialFinancial: Gerome, Alain R.; Total Financial Assessment $84.00; Total Payments and Credits $84.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketCause Of Action- Action Plaintiff's Claim ; File Date: 01/06/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Granting Waiver of Court Fees and Cost Signed- Order Granting Waiver of Court Fees and Cost Signed; Comment: By Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim filed- Plaintiff's Claim filed

    Read MoreRead Less