This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 08/04/2022 at 03:02:35 (UTC).

A&J Solutions vs. Sinomax International Holdings LLC

Case Summary

On 04/25/2022 A J Solutions filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Sinomax International Holdings LLC. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Culver Kapetan, Kristi, Brickey, Gabriel and Negin, Stephanie. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1235

  • Filing Date:

    04/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Negin, Stephanie

Culver Kapetan, Kristi

Brickey, Gabriel

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

A&J Solutions

a California corporation

Defendants

Sinomax International Holdings LLC

a California limited liability company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Willis, Robert J.

 

Court Documents

4/25/2022 Civil Case Cover Sheet

04/25/2022: 4/25/2022 Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/25/2022 Complaint

04/25/2022: 4/25/2022 Complaint

4/26/2022 Summons

04/26/2022: 4/26/2022 Summons

CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes

04/26/2022: CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes

5-4-22 Proof of Service of Summons and complaint (defective)

05/04/2022: 5-4-22 Proof of Service of Summons and complaint (defective)

5-6-22 Proof of Service of summons and complaint

05/06/2022: 5-6-22 Proof of Service of summons and complaint

5/9/22 - Amended Proof of Service

05/09/2022: 5/9/22 - Amended Proof of Service

6-20-22 Request for Entry of Default

06/20/2022: 6-20-22 Request for Entry of Default

6-22-22 Request for Entry of Default

06/22/2022: 6-22-22 Request for Entry of Default

6-23-22 Notice of Entry of Default against Defendant, Sinomax International Holdings, LLC

06/23/2022: 6-23-22 Notice of Entry of Default against Defendant, Sinomax International Holdings, LLC

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/24/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Negin, Stephanie; Hearing Time: 3:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Filed; Comment: Notice of Entry of Default against Defendant, Sinomax International Holdings, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default Denied; Comment: lines #1.b. and 1.c. do not match complaint and second page is incomplete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • DocketSummons and Complaint; Served: 05/04/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketSummons and Complaint; Served: 05/04/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • DocketSummons and Complaint; Unserved; Comment: DEFECTIVE Reason : Section #5.a. or #5.b. is incomplete as date and time of service is not included, also section #5.b.(3) is used for service to a post office box other than a USPS as it gives a description as to the place where service took place.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for A&J Solutions: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2022-25511 A&J Solutions $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for A&J Solutions: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: A&J Solutions; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Comment: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes and Case Management Conference (email)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where a California Limited Liability Company is a litigant

Latest cases where A CALIFORNIA LIMITED CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Willis, Robert J.