This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 06/12/2022 at 12:12:49 (UTC).

AHMC Anaheim Regional Medical Center vs The Dept. of Health Care Services of The State of CA/WM

Case Summary

On 04/13/2022 AHMC Anaheim Regional Medical Center filed an Other - Writ Of Mandamus lawsuit against The Dept of Health Care Services of The State of CA/WM. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Cullers, Mark. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1132

  • Filing Date:

    04/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Writ Of Mandamus

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Cullers, Mark

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

AHMC ANAHEIM REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, LP, a California limited partnership

ANAHEIM GLOBAL MEDICAL CENTER, INC., a California corporation

ANTELOPE VALLEY HEALTHCARE DISTRICT, a California healthcare district

CHILDREN???S HOSPITAL AT MISSION, a California nonprofit corporation

CHILDREN???S HOSPITAL LOS ANGELES, a California nonprofit corporation

CHILDREN???S HOSPITAL OF ORANGE COUNTY, a California nonprofit corporation

COMMUNITY HOSPITAL OF SAN BERNARDINO, a California nonprofit corporation

DIGNITY COMMUNITY CARE, a Colorado nonprofit corporation

DIGNITY HEALTH, a California nonprofit corporation

FRESNO COMMUNITY HOSPITAL AND MEDICAL CENTER, a California nonprofit corporation

GLENDALE ADVENTIST MEDICAL CENTER, a California nonprofit corporation

JOHN MUIR HEALTH, a California nonprofit corporation

LOMA LINDA UNIVERSITY CHILDREN???S HOSPITAL, a California nonprofit corporation

LOMA LINDA UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER, a California nonprofit corporation

LUCILE SALTER PACKARD CHILDREN???S HOSPITAL AT STANFORD, a California nonprofit co

ORANGE COUNTY GLOBAL MEDICAL CENTER, INC., a California corporation

POMONA VALLEY HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER, a California nonprofit corporation

PORT CITY OPERATING COMPANY, LLC, a California limited liability company

WHITE MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER, a California nonprofit corporation

Defendant and Respondent

THE DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH CARE SERVICES OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

1 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

Sze, Felicia Y

Respondent Attorney

Tillman, Lisa A.

 

Court Documents

4/13/22 Petition & Complaint for Writ of Mandate

04/13/2022: 4/13/22 Petition & Complaint for Writ of Mandate

4/13/22 Civil Complaint

04/13/2022: 4/13/22 Civil Complaint

4/15/22 Summons

04/13/2022: 4/15/22 Summons

Notice Filed

04/20/2022: Notice Filed

4-26-22 Proof of Service re: Complaint, Summons (no complaint filed, no POS-010 filed)

04/26/2022: 4-26-22 Proof of Service re: Complaint, Summons (no complaint filed, no POS-010 filed)

4-26-22 Proof of Service Re: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes

04/26/2022: 4-26-22 Proof of Service Re: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes

4-28-22 Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

04/28/2022: 4-28-22 Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

5-23-22 Declaration of Demurring or Moving Party ISO Automatic Extension Pursuant to CCP 430.41

05/23/2022: 5-23-22 Declaration of Demurring or Moving Party ISO Automatic Extension Pursuant to CCP 430.41

5-24-22 First Amended Petition for Writ of Mandate

05/24/2022: 5-24-22 First Amended Petition for Writ of Mandate

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/25/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Michelle Baass, in her capacity as Director of the Department of Health Care Services of the State of California: Government Exemption Claimed $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Michelle Baass, in her capacity as Director of the Department of Health Care Services of the State of California: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: Michelle Baass, in her capacity as Director of the Department of Health Care Services of the State of California; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for The Department of Health Care Services of The State of California: Government Exemption Claimed $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for The Department of Health Care Services of The State of California: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: The Department of Health Care Services of The State of California; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition filed; Comment: First Amended Petition for Writ of Mandate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDecl of Good Faith Attempt Filed Automatic 30-day extension; Comment: Declaration of Demurring or Moving Party in Support of Automatic Extension Pursuant to CCP 430.41

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Filed; Comment: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt -re: Petiton - The Department of Health Care Services of the State of California and Michelle Baass

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service; Comment: Proof of Service Re: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service; Comment: Proof of Service re: Complaint, Summons (no complaint filed on this action, also no POS-010 filed)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Filed; Comment: of Assignment of Judge for all purposes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for AHMC Anaheim Regional Medical Center, LP, a California limited partnership: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2022-23293 AHMC ANAHEIM REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, LP, a California limited partnership $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for AHMC Anaheim Regional Medical Center, LP, a California limited partnership: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: AHMC Anaheim Regional Medical Center, LP, a California limited partnership; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Port City Operating Company, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where LOMA LINDA UNIVERSITY CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where COMMUNITY HOSPITALOF SAN BERNARDINO is a litigant

Latest cases where Orange County Global Medical Center is a litigant