This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 11/11/2020 at 19:15:51 (UTC).

Adriana Quiroz vs. MV Parlier, LLC/Complex

Case Summary

On 03/05/2019 Adriana Quiroz filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against MV Parlier, LLC/Complex. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Black, Donald, Tharpe, D Tyler, Simpson, Alan and McGuire, Rosemary. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0788

  • Filing Date:

    03/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Black, Donald

Tharpe, D Tyler

Simpson, Alan

McGuire, Rosemary

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Flores, Alfredo M.

Gonzalez, Gilberto M.

Saldana, Maria

Espinoza, Felipe

Maldonado, Lucero

Hernandez, Roberto

Rodriguez, Jesus Rico

Aguilera, Adame

Gomez, Jose R.

Blanco, Ricardo Benito

Lopez, Jose

Placencia, Gilberto

Perez, Eustaquio, JR

Reyes, Victor

Mendez, Cesar

Rosales, Maria Fernanda

Mendoza, Vivian

Gomez, Armando

Defendants

Highlands Diversified, Inc.

Century Builders, LLC

102 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Belton, Jeffrey T.

Defendant Attorney

Winzeler, Courtney A

Other Attorneys

Toohey, John H.

Hazelton, M. Troy

Hebesha, Amanda G.

Bays, Stephen D.

Braasch, Debra L.

Bromgard, Todd D.

Hammons, Wallace W

Evans-Bonaell, Lynn E.

Fidger, Angela R.

Louis, Lena M.

Hugo, Heidi K.

Heath, Stephen B.

Eum, Margaret N.

Evans-Bonzell, Lynn E.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review

Request for Dismissal; Comment: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF CENCAL DRYWALL

Application to Determine Good Faith Settlement

Application; Comment: -Superior Contracting Corporation

Order Received for Signature

Proposed Order; Comment: Forwarded to: 501 (RA) Order Granting Application for Determination of GFS

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: Proof of Service in support of GFA

Order - Good Faith Settlement

Order - Good Faith Settlement; Judicial Officer: Tharpe, D Tyler; Comment: Order determining good faith of settlement pursuant to CCP 877.6

Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review

Request for Dismissal; Comment: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - PACIFIC DOOR

Answer Filed

Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance Fee; Comment: Answer to Cross-Complaint

Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review

Request for Dismissal

Notice Filed

Notice; Comment: Notice of Settlement

134 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketCase Management Conference- Judicial Officer: Tharpe, D Tyler; Hearing Time: 3:28 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment- Request for Dismissal; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: Pacific Door and Cabinet Company, a California Corporation; Comment: With prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal Received - Pending Review- Request for Dismissal; Comment: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - PACIFIC DOOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketChambers Work- Pre- Judicial Officer: Tharpe, D Tyler; Hearing Time: 5:30 PM; Result: Chambers Work - Order Submitted for Consideration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service- Proof of Service; Comment: Proof of Service in support of GFA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Received for Signature- Proposed Order; Comment: Forwarded to: 501 (RA) Order Granting Application for Determination of GFS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication to Determine Good Faith Settlement- Application; Comment: -Superior Contracting Corporation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Filed- Notice; Comment: Notice of Settlement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Names: Quiroz, Adriana; Blanco, Ricardo Benito; De Loera, Armando R.; Ibarra, Efren; Maciel, Viviana; Mendez, Cesar; Mendez, Omar; Mendoza, Ricardo; Mendoza, Vivian; Orellana, Edgar; Perez, Eustaquio, JR; Rodriguez, Jesus Rico; Rodriguez, Ana Isabel; Aguirre, Reyes; Cervantes, Sandra V.; Alvare De Quinonez, Alma G; Garcia, Marco A.; Gonzalez, Mario; Hinojosa, Marco Antonio; luna, Adan Aguilera; Martinez, Jose Luis; Ramirez, Maria I; Ruiz, Edward; Serrano, Ruben; Saigado, Beatriz; Aguilar, Jose; Guerra, Isidro Brambila; De Jimenez, Veronica Landeros; Marin, Justina; Reguis, Jessica; Torres, Ruben; Torres, Maricela; Comment: with prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal Received - Pending Review- Request for Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
246 More Docket Entries
  • 03/06/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for Quiroz, Adriana: Transaction Assessment $1000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for Quiroz, Adriana: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2019-17966 Quiroz, Adriana $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for Quiroz, Adriana: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • FinancialFinancial: Quiroz, Adriana; Total Financial Assessment $1,585.00; Total Payments and Credits $1,585.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter Received- Letter Received; Comment: Complex Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing- Notice of Hearing; Comment: CMC set for 7/11/19 at 3:30pm. Assignment of judge for all purposes.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet- Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed- Summons; Summons issued and filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed- Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/01/1900
  • DocketChambers Work- Pre- Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CENTURY BUILDERS, INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Eum, Margaret N

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lynn E Evans-Bonzell

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Hebesha, Amanda G.