This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 04/14/2022 at 02:00:34 (UTC).

Adrian Lemus vs. Woodside 06N, LP / COMPLEX

Case Summary

On 02/26/2019 Adrian Lemus filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against Woodside 06N, LP / COMPLEX. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Black, Donald, Tharpe, D Tyler, Simpson, Alan and McGuire, Rosemary. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0687

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Black, Donald

Tharpe, D Tyler

Simpson, Alan

McGuire, Rosemary

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Mar, Michael

Huckeba, Michael

Williams, Zoanne

Hopkins, Tina

Moua, Phua

Beck, Arnold

Martin, Allan

Clyde, David

Williams, Randall

Xiong, Thae

Ly, Bee

Lopez, Nathan

Cruz, Ronald

Kaur, Fnu Sarabjit

Hall, Clarance

Lemus, Charrise

Poyner, Tommy

Cruz, Joy

Cross Defendants and Defendants

Woodside 06N, LP

Woodside Homes of Fresno, LP.

74 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Blye, Anneke J

Cross Defendant and Defendant Attorney

Smith, Daniel J.

Other Attorneys

Lowe, Coleen H.

Kirkpatrick, Cheryl A

Schaffer, Todd A

Milionis, George K.

Harmata, Donald D.

McNeill, Timothy C.

Toohey, John H.

Millington, Kimberly A

Cox, Chip

 

Court Documents

Answer Filed

3551949_516Microsoft; Comment: Answer to Cross-Complaint

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing; Comment: *Department Change*

Notice Filed

Notice; Comment: or Stay of Proceedings

Answer Filed

Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance Fee

Notice Filed

Notice Filed; Comment: Notice of Assignment of Judge for all Purposes

Notice Filed

Notice; Comment: of Opting Out of Mediator/Special Master and Ex Parte Processes

Case Management Statement Filed

Case Management Statement

Notice Filed

Notice of Deposit of Jury Fees.pdf; Comment: Notice of Deposit of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement Filed

Case Management Statement; Comment: Case Management Statement- Unlimited Case

2/3/2022 Request for Dismissal

02/03/2022: 2/3/2022 Request for Dismissal

Minute Order Attachment

02/03/2022: Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

10/21/2021: Minute Order Attachment

48045Requestf00cb75a

10/06/2021: 48045Requestf00cb75a

Notice of Change of Address and Law Firm for Attorney of Rec

09/27/2021: Notice of Change of Address and Law Firm for Attorney of Rec

Minute Order Attachment

09/21/2021: Minute Order Attachment

Case Management Statement

09/01/2021: Case Management Statement

46066Requestf0031121

08/16/2021: 46066Requestf0031121

Request for Dismissal

07/23/2021: Request for Dismissal

182 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Tharpe, D Tyler; Hearing Time: 3:28 PM; Cancel Reason: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judgment Type: Request for Dismissal filed; Party; Names: Lemus, Adrian; Woodside 06N, LP; Lemus, Charrise; Ly, Bee; Thao, Yua; Xiong, Thae; Moua, Phua; Beck, Arnold; Clyde, David; Cruz, Ronald; Cruz, Joy; Fuentes, Jaime; Hall, Clarance; Hopkins, Tina; Hopkins, Michael; Huckeba, Michael; Kaur, Fnu Sarabjit; Lopez, Nathan; Mar, Michael; Marquez, Angel; Marquez, Maria; Martin, Allan; Motta, John; Poyner, Tommy; Poyner, Vickie; Sevilla, Erica; Vang, Andy; Williams, Randall; Williams, Zoanne; Woodside Homes of Fresno, Inc.; Woodside Homes of Fresno, LP.; Woodside Homes of Fresno, Inc; Woodside 06N, LP; A.L. Drywall, Inc.; A-1 Framing; Alcal Specialty Contracting, Inc.; ALS Concrete; Anlin Industries; Armen Masonry, Inc.; Barbosa Cabinets, Inc.; Blue Mountain Construction Services, Inc.; Broken Drum Insulation of Visalia; Campbell Painting, Inc.; Cencal Drywall, Inc.; Central Valley Contracting Specialists, Inc.; Central Valley Overhead Door, Inc.; Concrete Value Corp.; Creative Design Interiors, Inc.; CVC Construction Corp.; Darrell Herzog Enterprises, Inc.; Eman Electric; Equity Building Materials, Inc.; Equity Windows & Siding, Inc.; Fenceworks, Inc.; B F Glass, Inc.; Grant Construction, Inc.; Harvey Moskowitz Electrical Service; Heritage One Carpentry, Inc.; Hoover Contracting Services; J.R. Nelson Roofing, Inc.; John Rocha Custom Tractor Service; JR Pierce Plumbing Co., Inc. of Sacramento; Kenyon Plastering of Fresno, Inc.; Landscape Development, Inc.; M&B Carpentry, Inc.; Marc O'Polo Enterprises, Inc.; McClure Door, Inc.; Mid Valley Masonry, Inc.; Mid Valley Plastering, Inc.; Monschein Industries, Inc.; Petersen Dean, Inc.; Precision Industries Solid Surface and Millworks, Inc.; Precision Holdings, Inc.; Production Framing, Inc.; Sacramento A-1 Door; Sacramento Insulation Contractors; San Joaquin Stairs, Inc.; Security First Alarm King; Selectbuild Northern CA, Inc.; Steve J. Hess Electric; Superior Framing, Inc.; Talons Landscape Development, Inc.; Tri-Valley Plastering, Inc.; Villara Corporation; Walltech, Inc.; Concrete Value Corp.; CVC Construction Corp.; Zoes 1 through 50; Comment: With Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal Received - Pending Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order Attachment; Comment: with certificate of mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Tharpe, D Tyler; Hearing Time: 3:28 PM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order Attachment; Comment: with certificate of mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Tharpe, D Tyler; Hearing Time: 3:28 PM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judgment Type: Dismissal - Other filed; Comment; Comment: (With Prejudice); Party; Names: Woodside Homes of Fresno, Inc; Woodside 06N, LP; A.L. Drywall, Inc.; A-1 Framing; Alcal Specialty Contracting, Inc.; ALS Concrete; Anlin Industries; Armen Masonry, Inc.; Barbosa Cabinets, Inc.; Blue Mountain Construction Services, Inc.; Broken Drum Insulation of Visalia; Campbell Painting, Inc.; Cencal Drywall, Inc.; Central Valley Contracting Specialists, Inc.; Central Valley Overhead Door, Inc.; Concrete Value Corp.; Creative Design Interiors, Inc.; CVC Construction Corp.; Darrell Herzog Enterprises, Inc.; Eman Electric; Equity Building Materials, Inc.; Equity Windows & Siding, Inc.; Fenceworks, Inc.; B F Glass, Inc.; Grant Construction, Inc.; Harvey Moskowitz Electrical Service; Heritage One Carpentry, Inc.; Hoover Contracting Services; J.R. Nelson Roofing, Inc.; John Rocha Custom Tractor Service; JR Pierce Plumbing Co., Inc. of Sacramento; Kenyon Plastering of Fresno, Inc.; Landscape Development, Inc.; M&B Carpentry, Inc.; Marc O'Polo Enterprises, Inc.; McClure Door, Inc.; Mid Valley Masonry, Inc.; Mid Valley Plastering, Inc.; Monschein Industries, Inc.; Petersen Dean, Inc.; Precision Industries Solid Surface and Millworks, Inc.; Precision Holdings, Inc.; Production Framing, Inc.; Sacramento A-1 Door; Sacramento Insulation Contractors; San Joaquin Stairs, Inc.; Security First Alarm King; Selectbuild Northern CA, Inc.; Steve J. Hess Electric; Superior Framing, Inc.; Talons Landscape Development, Inc.; Tri-Valley Plastering, Inc.; Villara Corporation; Walltech, Inc.; Comment: As to 1st Cross Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal Received - Pending Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address Filed; Comment: and Law Firm for Attorney of Record

    Read MoreRead Less
140 More Docket Entries
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Document Filed; Comment: First Amended Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for Lemus, Adrian: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2019-15301 Lemus, Adrian $1435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for Lemus, Adrian: Transaction Assessment $1435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • FinancialFinancial: Lemus, Adrian; Total Financial Assessment $1,435.00; Total Payments and Credits $1,435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Comment: CMC set for 7/3/19 at 3:30pm. Assignment of Judge for all purposes.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/01/1900
  • DocketChambers Work- Pre; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WOODSIDE HOMES OF FRESNO, INC is a litigant

Latest cases where WOODSIDE 06N, LP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lowe, Coleen

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MILLINGTON, KIMBERLY A