This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 04/21/2022 at 08:41:15 (UTC).

Addie Huff vs. Sierra Meadows Senior Living, LLC / COMPLEX / CLASS ACTION

Case Summary

On 06/01/2020 Addie Huff filed an Other lawsuit against Sierra Meadows Senior Living, LLC / COMPLEX / CLASS ACTION. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno County BF Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are McGuire, Rosemary and Tharpe, D Tyler. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1563

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

McGuire, Rosemary

Tharpe, D Tyler

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Huff, Addie

by and through her successor in interest Crystal Stansberry

Defendants

Sierra Meadows Senior Living, LLC

Hurley, Donna

Cross Plaintiff

Moes 1-25

Cross Defendants and Defendants

Hurley, Donna

Sierra Meadows Senior Living LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Garcia, Stephen M.

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorney

Lamprou, Chris

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service

3757126_681PROOFOFSE

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Objection filed

Objection; Comment: Defendant's Jeld-Wen V. Superior Court Objection

Answer Filed

Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance Fee

Notice Filed

Notice of Jury Deposit; Comment: Defendant's Demand for Jury Trial and Notice of Advance Payment of Jury Fee Deposit

Summons issued and filed

Amended Document Filed; Comment: Summons on First Amended Complaint

Cross Complaint Filed

Cross Action/Cross Complaint; Comment: 1st Cross-Complaint

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Amended Document Filed

Amended Complaint - Claim Amount Unchanged (No Fee); Comment: First Amended Complaint filed.

3-16-22 Notice of Withdrawal of Request for Pre-Trial Discovery Conference

03/16/2022: 3-16-22 Notice of Withdrawal of Request for Pre-Trial Discovery Conference

Order filed

03/04/2022: Order filed

Defense opposition to Plaintiffs request for pretrial discovery conference 02/24/22

03/03/2022: Defense opposition to Plaintiffs request for pretrial discovery conference 02/24/22

2/24/2022-Request for pretrial discovery conference

02/24/2022: 2/24/2022-Request for pretrial discovery conference

2/22/22 Notice of WD of Motion HRG 3/2/22

02/22/2022: 2/22/22 Notice of WD of Motion HRG 3/2/22

2/16/22 Separate Statement ~ Hearing 3/2/22

02/16/2022: 2/16/22 Separate Statement ~ Hearing 3/2/22

2/16/22 Declaration ~ Hearing 3/2/22

02/16/2022: 2/16/22 Declaration ~ Hearing 3/2/22

2/16/22 Opposition ~ Hearing 3/2/22

02/16/2022: 2/16/22 Opposition ~ Hearing 3/2/22

11/18/21 - Separate Statement HRG 3/2/22

11/18/2021: 11/18/21 - Separate Statement HRG 3/2/22

78 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketContinued Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: McGuire, Rosemary; Hearing Time: 3:28 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • DocketPre Trial Discovery Conference; Judicial Officer: McGuire, Rosemary; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Filed; Comment: Notice of Withdrawal of Request for Pre-Trial Discovery Conference (forwarded to dept. 502)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder filed; Judicial Officer: McGuire, Rosemary; Comment: on request for pretrial discovery conference. PTDC is set for 3-18-2022 at 9:00 a.m.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • DocketChambers Work- Pre; Judicial Officer: McGuire, Rosemary; Hearing Time: 5:30 PM; Result: Uncontested

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOpposition to Request for Pre-Trial Discovery filed; Comment: Forwarded to Dept. 502

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketMotion - Sanctions; Judicial Officer: McGuire, Rosemary; Hearing Time: 3:27 PM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar; Comment: Filed 11/18/21 ~ Steven Garcia

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Pre-Trial Discovery filed; Comment: Forwarded to: 502

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Filed; Comment: Notice of Withdrawal of Plaintiff's Motion for Terminating, Issue and Evidentiary Sanctions

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
59 More Docket Entries
  • 06/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Huff, Addie: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2020-38667 Huff, Addie $1435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Huff, Addie: Transaction Assessment $1435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • FinancialFinancial: Huff, Addie; Total Financial Assessment $1,555.00; Total Payments and Credits $1,555.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Comment: CMC set for 10/13/20 at 3:30pm. Assignment of Judge for all purposes.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration Filed; Comment: of Crystal Stansberry as successor in interest

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Sierra Meadows Senior Living, LLC is a litigant