This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/12/2018 at 10:30:58 (UTC).

CONSOLIDATED WITH 16CECG01276/NON LEAD CASE

Case Summary

On 04/27/2016 CONSOLIDATED WITH 16CECG01276/NON LEAD CASE was filed as a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Black, Donald. The case status is Other - Consolidated.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1348

  • Filing Date:

    04/27/2016

  • Case Status:

    Other - Consolidated

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Black, Donald

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Plaintiffs

Zenith Insurance Company

Mulholland Webster, LLC

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

Mulholland Citrus Growers Association

Randell Equipment Manufacturing, Inc

Mulholland Webster, LLC

Mulholland Citrus Ranch

Mulholland Citrus Ranch AND Mulholland Citrus Growers Association

Afourer, Inc.

Randell Equipment Manufacturing, Inc.

Defendants, Plaintiffs and Cross Plaintiffs

Mulholland Webster, LLC

Mulholland Citrus Ranch

Defendant and Cross Defendant

Randell Equipment Manufacturing, Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Arakawa, Gregory P.

Kern, Richard J.

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

Schick, Malcolm D.

Arakawa, Gregory P.

Cross Plaintiff Attorney

Porter, Corban J.

 

Court Documents

Answer Filed

Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance Fee

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Summons issued and filed; Comment: Summons - First Amended Complaint

Return filed

Return filed; Comment: Return of (Stipulation to Strike Matters from Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint;Order)

Answer Filed

Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance Fee; Comment: Answer to Cross-complaint by Randell Equipment . Manufacturing, Inc.

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing; Comment: Notice of CMC and Assignment of Judge for all purposes.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: Randell Equipment Manufacturing, Inc.

Civil Complaint filed

Complaint

Amended Document Filed

Amended Complaint - Claim Amount Unchanged (No Fee); Comment: First Amended Complaint

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Summons issued and filed

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/03/2016
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judicial Officer: Black, Donald; Judgment Type: Order Consolidating Actions; Party Names: Zenith Insurance Company; Randell Equipment Manufacturing, Inc; Afourer, Inc.; Afourer, Inc.; Mulholland Webster, LLC; Randell Equipment Manufacturing, INC; Mulholland Webster, LLC; Mulholland Webster, LLC; Randell Equipment Manufacturing, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2016
  • Case Management Conference- Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Consolidated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer Filed- Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance Fee; Comment: Answer to Cross-complaint by Randell Equipment . Manufacturing, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Cross Complaint Filed- Cross Action/Cross Complaint (No Fee); Comment: 2nd cross-complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer Filed- Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2016
  • Case Management Conference- Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Deposit, payment,disbursment- Notice of Jury Deposit; Comment: Jury fee deposit in the amount of $150.00 on behalf of Randell Equipment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Statement Filed- Case Management Statement; Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2016
  • Summons and Complaint- Comment: First Amended Summons/Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 08/12/2016
  • Financial info for Randell Equipment Manufacturing, Inc: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2016-35041 Randell Equipment Manufacturing, Inc $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2016
  • Financial info for Randell Equipment Manufacturing, Inc: Transaction Assessment $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2016
  • Financial info for Randell Equipment Manufacturing, Inc: Mail Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2016-00021972 Schick, Malcolm D. $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2016
  • Financial info for Randell Equipment Manufacturing, Inc: Transaction Assessment $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2016
  • Financial info for Randell Equipment Manufacturing, Inc: Mail Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2016-00021203 Schick, Malcolm D. $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2016
  • Financial info for Randell Equipment Manufacturing, Inc: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2016
  • Financial: Randell Equipment Manufacturing, Inc; Total Financial Assessment $605.00; Total Payments and Credits $605.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2016
  • Financial info for Zenith Insurance Company: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2016-17742 ZENITH INSURANCE COMPANY $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2016
  • Financial info for Zenith Insurance Company: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2016
  • Financial: Zenith Insurance Company; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ZENITH INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PORTER CORBAN JAMES