This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 08/11/2019 at 14:23:55 (UTC).

Yolanda Bell vs Vernell Bell, JR

Case Summary

On 06/08/2018 Yolanda Bell filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Vernell Bell, JR. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Gamoian, Lisa, Tharpe, D Tyler and Kalemkarian, David. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3357

  • Filing Date:

    06/08/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Gamoian, Lisa

Tharpe, D Tyler

Kalemkarian, David

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Bell, Yolanda

Respondent

Bell, Vernell, JR

Minors

Bell, Phillip

Bell, Moriah

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/20/2019
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judicial Officer: Gamoian, Lisa; Judgment Type: Final Judgment Dissolution/MSA; Party Names: Bell, Yolanda; Bell, Vernell, JR; Bell, Phillip; Bell, Moriah; Comment: (Marital termination date 03/20/19)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • 1 Family - Centered Status Conference- Judicial Officer: Kalemkarian, David; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • Declaration regarding Service of Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • Declaration for Default or Uncontested Disso or Legal Sep

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • Documents sent to- Comment: judgment to FLEX

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • Return Letter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • Documents sent to- Comment: Default shelf w/Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • Request to Enter Default Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • Declaration regarding Service of Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 06/29/2018
  • Proof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • Summons issued and filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • Uniform Child Custody Jurisdiction Act

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • Petition for Dissolution with Children- Comment: Summons issued yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • Financial info for Bell, Vernell, JR: Counter Payment Receipt # FAM-2018-00011878 Bell, Vernell, JR $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • Financial info for Bell, Vernell, JR: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • Financial: Bell, Vernell, JR; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • Financial info for Bell, Yolanda: Counter Payment Receipt # FAM-2018-00008131 Bell, Yolanda $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • Financial info for Bell, Yolanda: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • Financial: Bell, Yolanda; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.