This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 08:59:25 (UTC).

Yesenia Montemayor vs Christopher Cabral

Case Summary

On 01/04/2017 Yesenia Montemayor filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Christopher Cabral. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Dalesandro, Samuel, Black, Donald, Snauffer, Mark and Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0017

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Dalesandro, Samuel

Black, Donald

Snauffer, Mark

Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.

 

Party Details

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Plaintiffs

Huerta, Ruben S.

Montemayor, Yesenia M.

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Plaintiffs

Jensen, Patrick A.

Cabral, Christopher

Huerta, Ruben S.

Meredith, Mary

Defendants and Cross Defendants

Cabral, Christopher

Meredith, Mary

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Armstrong, Nolan S

Baradat, Daniel R.

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

Burke, Michael S

Smith, Shyla

Armstrong, Nolan S

 

Court Documents

Judgment

Dismissal - Other filed; Judgment Type: Dismissal - Other filed; Party Names: Huerta, Ruben S.; Cabral, Christopher; Meredith, Mary; Comment: With Prejudice

Judgment

Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: Huerta, Ruben S.; Comment: with prejudice

Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review

1880925_385Dismissal; Comment: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review

Request for Dismissal

ADR Stipulation Mediation filed

Stipulation; Comment: Parties to engage in mediation. Mediator: James Dilling

Cross Complaint Filed

Cross Action/Cross Complaint

Return filed

Return filed; Comment: Return of (Ruben S. Huerta's Answer; Cross-Complaint; Summons on Cross-Complaint ck# 121600 $435.00)

Summons issued and filed

Summons

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Summons issued and filed

Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review

1880925_100Dismissal; Comment: Request for Dismissal

Notice Filed

Notice of Jury Deposit; Comment: Jury fee deposited in the amount of $150.00 on behalf of Defendant, Ruben S. Huerta

Notice Filed

1543842_384CabralNtc; Comment: Notice of Change of Firm Name

Notice Filed

Notice of Posting Jury Fees - Jensen.pdf; Comment: Jury fee deposited in the amount of $150.00 on behalf of Defendant, Patrick A. Jensen.

Case Management Statement Filed

Case Management Statement

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: Patrick A. Jensen

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Summons issued and filed

Answer Filed

1497776_475Answercro; Comment: Answer to Cross-Complaint

Civil Complaint filed

Complaint

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Request for Dismissal filed; Judgment Type: Request for Dismissal filed; Party Names: Cabral, Christopher; Montemayor, Yesenia M.; Meredith, Mary; Huerta, Ruben S.; Jensen, Patrick A.; Cabral, Christopher; Meredith, Mary; Huerta, Ruben S.; Huerta, Ruben S.; Cabral, Christopher; Meredith, Mary; Comment: With Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal - Other filed; Judgment Type: Dismissal - Other filed; Party Names: Huerta, Ruben S.; Cabral, Christopher; Meredith, Mary; Comment: With Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Dismissal - Other filed; Party Name: Huerta, Ruben S.; Comment: With prejudice; Cross-Complaint filed by Christopher Cabral and Mary Meredith on 02/03/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Dismissal - Other filed; Party Names: Cabral, Christopher; Meredith, Mary; Comment: With Prejudice; As to Defendants Christopher Cabral and Mary Meredith only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: Huerta, Ruben S.; Comment: with prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • CRC 3.1385 After Settlement- Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Cancel Reason: Settled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • Jury Trial- Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Settled; Comment: Requested by both parties with estimated time of 5 days.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • Trial Readiness- Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Settled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • Mandatory Settlement Conference- Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Settled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review- Request for Dismissal.pdf

    Read MoreRead Less
48 More Docket Entries
  • 03/03/2017
  • Financial info for Meredith, Mary: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • Financial: Meredith, Mary; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2017
  • Financial info for Montemayor, Yesenia M.: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2017-00611 Montemayor, Yesenia M. $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2017
  • Financial info for Montemayor, Yesenia M.: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2017
  • Financial: Montemayor, Yesenia M.; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • Financial info for Cabral, Christopher: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2017-19191 Cabral, Christopher $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • Financial info for Cabral, Christopher: Transaction Assessment $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • Financial info for Cabral, Christopher: EFile Payment Receipt # ACCT-2017-00840 Cabral, Christopher $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • Financial info for Cabral, Christopher: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • Financial: Cabral, Christopher; Total Financial Assessment $585.00; Total Payments and Credits $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less