This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 06/19/2022 at 21:32:46 (UTC).

XXXXX

Case Summary

On 07/24/2018 XXXXX was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno Superior Courthouse Downtown located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Black, Donald. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***2751

  • Filing Date:

    07/24/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Black, Donald

 

Party Details

Appellant

Alvarenga, Carlos

Respondent

The People of the State of California

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorneys

Public Defender's Office

Simsarian, Kendall D.

Respondent Attorney

Fresno District Attorney's Office

 

Court Documents

Receipt filed

Receipt filed; Comment: Return Receipt signed completed record received to the lower court. Judgment is affirmed

Appellate Remittitur Issued

Appellate Remittitur Issued

Judgment

Judgment in Appellate case entered with opinion; Judicial Officer: Black, Donald; Judgment Type: Judgment in Appellate case entered with opinion; Party Names: Alvarenga, Carlos; The People of the State of California

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Notice of Hearing

Notice Filed; Comment: Hearing on Appeal set for May 1, 2019 has been continued to June 5, 2019 D502 at 8:30am.

Appellants Reply Brief Filed

Appellants Reply Brief Filed

Respondents Brief Filed

Respondents Brief Filed

Appellate case briefing schedule and notice of hearing filed

Appellate case briefing schedule and notice of hearing filed; Comment: # 2nd Revised

Order Extending Time for filing of Respondent's Brief filed

Order Extending Time for filing of Respondent's Brief filed; Judicial Officer: Black, Donald

Receipt filed

07/09/2019: Receipt filed

Appellate Remittitur Issued

07/05/2019: Appellate Remittitur Issued

Minute Order Attachment

06/05/2019: Minute Order Attachment

Notice Filed

04/25/2019: Notice Filed

Appellants Reply Brief Filed

03/06/2019: Appellants Reply Brief Filed

Respondents Brief Filed

02/13/2019: Respondents Brief Filed

Appellate case briefing schedule and notice of hearing filed

01/09/2019: Appellate case briefing schedule and notice of hearing filed

Order Extending Time for filing of Respondent's Brief filed

01/08/2019: Order Extending Time for filing of Respondent's Brief filed

Order Received for Signature

01/07/2019: Order Received for Signature

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReceipt filed; Comment: Return Receipt signed completed record received to the lower court. Judgment is affirmed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAppellate Remittitur Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer: Black, Donald; Judgment Type: Judgment in Appellate case entered with opinion; Party; Names: Alvarenga, Carlos; The People of the State of California

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • DocketHearing - Appeal; Judicial Officer: Black, Donald; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard; Appellant; Attorney: Simsarian, Kendall D.; Respondent; Attorney: Fresno District Attorney's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Comment: Hearing on Appeal set for May 1, 2019 has been continued to June 5, 2019 D502 at 8:30am.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAppellants Reply Brief Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRespondents Brief Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAppellate case briefing schedule and notice of hearing filed; Comment: # 2nd Revised

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Extending Time for filing of Respondent's Brief filed; Judicial Officer: Black, Donald

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 01/07/2019
  • DocketChambers Work- Pre; Judicial Officer: Black, Donald; Hearing Time: 5:30 PM; Result: Chambers Work - Order Submitted for Consideration; Comment: cancelled - clerical error

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAppellants Opening Brief Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAppellate case briefing schedule and notice of hearing filed; Comment: #1 REVISED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketExtension of Time to File Opening Brief; Comment: Order extending time for filing of appellant's opening brief to (12/13/18) signed by Judge Rosemary McGuire filed in Appellate Dept.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • DocketChambers Work- Pre; Judicial Officer: Black, Donald; Hearing Time: 5:30 PM; Result: Chambers Work - Order Submitted for Consideration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Received for Signature; Comment: Forwarded to Dept:20 Order for: Extension of Time (Appellate opening Brief.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAppellate case briefing schedule and notice of hearing filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAppellate Document filed; Comment: Receipt for Completed Record on Appeal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • DocketOrder Received for Signature; Comment: Signed and returned to clerk's office for further processing Forwarded to Dept: 502 Order for: Order appointing attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • DocketChambers Work- Pre; Judicial Officer: Black, Donald; Hearing Time: 5:30 PM; Result: Chambers Work - Order Submitted for Consideration

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Simsarian, Kendall