This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 08:10:02 (UTC).

Willie Johnson vs Sodhi Hayer/LEAD CASE

Case Summary

On 11/07/2016 Willie Johnson filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Sodhi Hayer/LEAD CASE. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Simpson, Alan, Snauffer, Mark, Hamilton, Jeffrey Y. and Black, Donald. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3589

  • Filing Date:

    11/07/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Simpson, Alan

Snauffer, Mark

Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.

Black, Donald

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Johnson, Willie

Muhammad, Asianae

Johnson, Le Will

Roberts, Asia-nique

Muhammad, Samaayiah

State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

Consolidated Plaintiff

Lira, Roxanne

Defendants and Consolidated 3Rd Party Defendants

Mike's Liquor

Hayer, Sodhi

Hayer, Sodhi S.

Mikes's Liquor

Gill, Jagjot Kaur

Amar Retail, Inc.

Hayer, Sodhi S

Amar Retail, Inc

Consolidated 3Rd Party Plaintiff

Castro, Azia

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Kapetan, Peter N.

Taleisnik, Martin

Mahfouz, Richard L, II

Consolidated Plaintiff Attorney

Coleman, Mark W.

Defendant Attorneys

Davila, Vanessa S

Neilson, Bruce A.

Sarkissian, Patrick J.

Consolidated 3Rd Party Defendant Attorney

Patrick, Sarkissian

Consolidated 3Rd Party Plaintiff Attorney

Marks, Timothy I

 

Court Documents

Answer Filed

Answer of Hayer to First Amended Complaint.pdf; Comment: Answer to First Amended Complaint

Minute Order Attachment (Tentative Rulings Only)

Civil Document; Comment: Clerk's Certificate of Mailing attached.

Opposition filed

Opposition; Comment: Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant Hayer's Motion to Strike Portions of the Complaint

Case Management Statement Filed

Defenfdant's CMC Statement.pdf

Notice Filed

Notice; Comment: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt-Civil

Amended Document Filed

Amended Complaint - Claim Amount Unchanged (No Fee); Comment: 1st Amended Complaint

Substitution of Attorney Filed

Substitution of Attorney; Comment: No action taken; duplicate filing

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Civil case cover sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Deposit, payment,disbursment

Notice of Jury Deposit; Comment: Notice of Jury Deposit/ Deposit Payment on behalf of Plaintiff

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: Proof of Service for Defendant Jagot Kaur Gill

Notice of Motion

Notice of Motion to Strike.pdf; Comment: and Motion to:Strike Portions of Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declaration of Larry T Valdez

Demand for Jury Trial filed

Demand for Jury Trial.pdf

Order Received for Signature

Application and Appointment Guardian Ad Litem; Comment: Forwarded to Dept: 503 on 3/14/2017 Order for: Application for GAL re: Asianae Muhammad Forwarded to 4th floor clerk's office for further processing.

Order Received for Signature

Application and Appointment Guardian Ad Litem; Comment: Forwarded to Dept: 503 on 3/14/2017 Order for: Application for GAL re: Le Will Johnson Forwarded to 4th floor clerk's office for further processing.

Substitution of Attorney Filed

Substitution of Attorney; Comment: Old Attorney: Pro Per New Attorney: Martin Talcisnik Bar #172218

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons - Defendant Mike's Liquor; POS by Mail

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Summons issued and filed

56 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/19/2019
  • Jury Trial- Judicial Officer: Simpson, Alan; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: Req by Both; Est time 3 - 7 Days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • Trial Readiness- Judicial Officer: Simpson, Alan; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • Mandatory Settlement Conference- Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • Settled Statement Filed- Comment: Mandatory Settlement Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice Filed- Notice Filed; Comment: Assignment of Judge Alan M. Simpson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • Settled Statement Filed- Comment: DEFENDANT SODHI S. HA YER'S MANDATORY SETTLEMENT BRIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Stipulation and Order to Continue Trial filed- Stipulation and Order to Continue Trial filed; Judicial Officer: Black, Donald; Comment: Trial continued to: 8/19/19 at 9:00am in dept. 502 TRR continued to 8/16/19 at 9:30am in dept. 502 MSC continued to 8/1/19 at 10:00am in dept. 575

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • Chambers Work- Pre- Judicial Officer: Black, Donald; Hearing Time: 5:30 PM; Result: Chambers Work - Order Submitted for Consideration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Stipulation Filed- Stipulation to Continue Trial signed.pdf; Comment: To continue trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Received for Signature- Order to Cont Trial.pdf; Comment: Proposed Order to continue trial (Forwarded to dept. 502)

    Read MoreRead Less
100 More Docket Entries
  • 11/08/2016
  • Financial: Johnson, Willie; Total Financial Assessment $605.00; Total Payments and Credits $605.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • Financial info for Hayer, Sodhi S.: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2018-65723 Hayer, Sodhi S. $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • Financial info for Hayer, Sodhi S.: Transaction Assessment $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • Financial info for Hayer, Sodhi S.: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2018-41537 Hayer, Sodhi S. $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • Financial info for Hayer, Sodhi S.: Transaction Assessment $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • Financial info for Hayer, Sodhi S.: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2017-21247 Hayer, Sodhi S. $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • Financial info for Hayer, Sodhi S.: Transaction Assessment $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • Financial info for Hayer, Sodhi S.: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2017-14944 Hayer, Sodhi S. $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • Financial info for Hayer, Sodhi S.: Transaction Assessment $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • Financial: Hayer, Sodhi S.; Total Financial Assessment $725.00; Total Payments and Credits $725.00

    Read MoreRead Less