This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 06/07/2022 at 06:19:38 (UTC).

William Price vs. Jose Lopez

Case Summary

On 10/21/2015 William Price filed an Other lawsuit against Jose Lopez. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno County BF Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Cullers, Mark, Diaz, Monica, Snauffer, Mark, Gamoian, Lisa, Ikeda, Dale and Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7854

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Cullers, Mark

Diaz, Monica

Snauffer, Mark

Gamoian, Lisa

Ikeda, Dale

Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Price, William Jay

Defendant

Lopez, Jose

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Phillips, James C.

Roman, Nicole L

 

Court Documents

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Ex parte Filed

Ex parte Filed; Comment: Ex parte Request for Production Orders

Notice Filed

Notice Filed

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Objection filed

Objection filed; Comment: To Defendant's Motion and Plaintiff's Request for Summary Judgment

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Summons issued and filed

Summons issued and filed

{{FilingCodeDescription}}

05/16/2018: {{FilingCodeDescription}}

Return Letter

05/07/2018: Return Letter

Minute Order Attachment

01/25/2018: Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

01/16/2018: Minute Order Attachment

Proposed Order

01/03/2018: Proposed Order

Motion (No Fee)

01/03/2018: Motion (No Fee)

Objection filed

01/03/2018: Objection filed

Case Management Statement

12/28/2017: Case Management Statement

Substitution of Attorney

12/21/2017: Substitution of Attorney

113 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment; Comment: Limited Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn Letter; Comment: The document(s) received via mail are being returned unprocessed. Please note effective July 1st , 20I7, documents filed by represented parties in all Limited Civil actions must be filed electronicially. Visit our website for more information: http://www.fresno.courts.ca.gov. . Thank you

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer: Cullers, Mark; Judgment Type: Summary Judgment Entered; Party; Names: Price, William Jay; Lopez, Jose; Judgment - Non-Monetary Award; Awarded To; Lopez, Jose; Awarded Against; Price, William Jay

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • DocketOrder Granted; Judicial Officer: Cullers, Mark; Comment: For entry of Judment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order Attachment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • DocketMotion - Entry of Judgment; Judicial Officer: Cullers, Mark; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order Attachment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • FinancialFinancial info for Lopez, Jose: Government Exemption Claimed $60.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
98 More Docket Entries
  • 11/13/2015
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Mailing; Comment: I certify that I am not a party to this cause and a true copy of the Notice of Calendar Setting re: Fee Waiver Hearing was placed in a sealed envelope and placed for collection and mailing on the date and at the place shown below following our ordinary business practice. I am readily familiar with this court's practice for collection and processing correspondence for mailing. On the same day that correspondence is placed for collection and mailing, it is deposited in the ordinary course of business with the United States Postal Service with postage fully prepaid. Place of Mailing: Fresno, California on 11/13/15. Parties served: Plaintiff only.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2015
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Mailing; Comment: I certify that I am not a party to this cause and a true copy of the Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) was placed in a sealed envelope and placed for collection and mailing on the date and at the place shown below following our ordinary business practice. I am readily familiar with this court's practice for collection and processing correspondence for mailing. On the same day that correspondence is placed for collection and mailing, it is deposited in the ordinary course of business with the United States Postal Service with postage fully prepaid. Place of Mailing: Fresno, California on 10/22/10. Parties served: Plaintiff ONLY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFee Waiver Denied; Judicial Officer: Gamoian, Lisa; Comment: See scanned document. Fee Waiver hearing set.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2015
  • FinancialFinancial info for Price, William Jay: Transaction Assessment $225.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2015
  • FinancialFinancial: Price, William Jay; Total Financial Assessment $285.00; Total Payments and Credits $285.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Comment: Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2015
  • DocketOrder Received for Signature; Comment: Forwarded to Dept: 404 Order for: Request for Waive Court Fees

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2015
  • DocketChambers Work- Pre; Judicial Officer: Gamoian, Lisa; Hearing Time: 5:30 PM; Result: Chambers Work - Order Submitted for Consideration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less