This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 04:41:38 (UTC).

Wieslaw Kowalski vs Jacob Jacobs

Case Summary

On 06/22/2016 Wieslaw Kowalski filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Jacob Jacobs. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Cullers, Mark, Snauffer, Mark and Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2004

  • Filing Date:

    06/22/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Cullers, Mark

Snauffer, Mark

Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kowalski, Wieslaw

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

Hinojosa, Rachelle Rejee

Ly, Feng

Moua, Pahoua

Lyvangkhue, Nathan

Jacobs, Jacob M.

Cross Defendant

Jacobs, Jacob

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mazzela, Timothy W.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

Stevens, Daniel A

Yakura, Brian K.

Armstrong, Nolan S

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorney

Armstrong, Nolan S

 

Court Documents

ADR Stipulation Mediation filed

Stipulation; Comment: Parties to engage in mediation. Mediator: James A. Dilling

Notice Filed

1475946_031JuryFees.; Comment: Jury Fee deposit in the amount of $150.00 on behalf of

Notice of Change of Address Filed

Notice of Change of Address; Comment: Notice of Change of Address

Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Notice Filed

Notice of Jury Deposit; Comment: Jury Fee Deposit in the amount of $150.00 on behalf of Defendant, Jacob Jacobs.

Answer Filed

1553864_691AnswertoC; Comment: Answer to Cross-Complaint

Case Management Statement Filed

Case Management Statement; Comment: Case Management Statement

Answer Filed

Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance Fee

Judgment

Request for Dismissal filed; Judgment Type: Request for Dismissal filed; Party Names: Kowalski, Wieslaw; Jacobs, Jacob M.; Hinojosa, Rachelle Rejee; Lyvangkhue, Nathan; Ly, Feng; Moua, Pahoua; Jacobs, Jacob; Hinojosa, Rachelle Rejee; Lyvangkhue, Nathan; Ly, Feng; Moua, Pahoua; Comment: with prejudice - entire actions

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Summons issued and filed; Comment: Summons on Cross-Complaint

Civil Complaint filed

Civil Document

Summons issued and filed

Civil Document

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review

Request for Full Dismissal; Comment: Request for Full Dismissal

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Summons issued and filed; Comment: Summons on Cross-Complaint

Letter of Documents Returned Without Filing

Letter of Documents Returned Without Filing; Comment: Returned: check #31839 $150.00 Reason: Documents are being returned unprocessed. Please note effective July 1, 2016, documents filed by represented parties in all unlimited civil actions must be filed electronically. Visit our website for more information: http://www.fresno.courts.ca.gov

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Request for Dismissal filed; Judgment Type: Request for Dismissal filed; Party Names: Kowalski, Wieslaw; Jacobs, Jacob M.; Hinojosa, Rachelle Rejee; Lyvangkhue, Nathan; Ly, Feng; Moua, Pahoua; Jacobs, Jacob; Hinojosa, Rachelle Rejee; Lyvangkhue, Nathan; Ly, Feng; Moua, Pahoua; Comment: with prejudice - entire actions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • Jury Trial- Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissed; Comment: Requested by both parties with estimated time of 6-7 days.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • Trial Readiness- Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • Mandatory Settlement Conference- Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed- Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review- Request for Full Dismissal; Comment: Request for Full Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Change of Address Filed- Notice of Change of Address; Comment: Notice of Change of Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • OSC - ADR Stipulation- Judicial Officer: Cullers, Mark; Hearing Time: 9:07 AM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ADR Stipulation Mediation filed- Stipulation; Comment: Parties to engage in mediation. Mediator: James A. Dilling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • Referral to ADR

    Read MoreRead Less
43 More Docket Entries
  • 04/24/2017
  • Financial info for Jacobs, Jacob M.: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2017-21279 Jacobs, Jacob M. $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • Financial info for Jacobs, Jacob M.: Transaction Assessment $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • Financial info for Jacobs, Jacob M.: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2017-14720 Jacobs, Jacob M. $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • Financial info for Jacobs, Jacob M.: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • Financial: Jacobs, Jacob M.; Total Financial Assessment $585.00; Total Payments and Credits $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2017
  • Financial info for Kowalski, Wieslaw: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2017-09611 Kowalski, Wieslaw $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2017
  • Financial info for Kowalski, Wieslaw: Transaction Assessment $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2016
  • Financial info for Kowalski, Wieslaw: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2016-00022667 Mazzela, Timothy W. $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2016
  • Financial info for Kowalski, Wieslaw: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2016
  • Financial: Kowalski, Wieslaw; Total Financial Assessment $585.00; Total Payments and Credits $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.