This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/13/2018 at 11:45:35 (UTC).

Wheels Financial Group, LLC vs. Jesse Fox

Case Summary

On 11/07/2016 Wheels Financial Group, LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Jesse Fox. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Gamoian, Lisa. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2530

  • Filing Date:

    11/07/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Gamoian, Lisa

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

1-800LoanMart

Wheels Financial Group, LLC

Defendant

Fox, Jesse W.

 

Court Documents

Judgment

Civil Document; Civil Document; Judicial Officer: Gamoian, Lisa; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Uncontested; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To:; Wheels Financial Group, LLC; Awarded Against:; Fox, Jesse W.; Amount; Damages: $2,500.00; Costs: $135.50; Total: $2635.50; Party Names: Wheels Financial Group, LLC; Fox, Jesse W.

Judgment

Civil Document; Civil Document; Judicial Officer: Gamoian, Lisa; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Uncontested; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To:; Wheels Financial Group, LLC; Awarded Against:; Fox, Jesse W.; Amount; Damages: $2,500.00; Costs: $135.50; Total: $2635.50; Party Names: Wheels Financial Group, LLC; Fox, Jesse W.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: Earnings Witholding Order, Employer Return, Emplyer/Employee Instructions, Writ of Execution

Notice of Change of Address Filed

Notice of Change of Address Filed

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment Filed

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment Filed; Comment: Costs: $0.00 Credit: $0.00 Interest: $ 29.60

Writ of Execution Issued

Writ of Execution Issued; Comment: County: Mariposa Amount: 2690.10

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of; Comment: Name: Roberto Montejano, Consumer Litigation Specialist

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Plaintiff's Claim filed

Plaintiff's Claim filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Civil Document; Civil Document; Judicial Officer: Gamoian, Lisa; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Uncontested; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To:; Wheels Financial Group, LLC; Awarded Against:; Fox, Jesse W.; Amount; Damages: $2,500.00; Costs: $135.50; Total: $2635.50; Party Names: Wheels Financial Group, LLC; Fox, Jesse W.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service- Proof of Service; Comment: Earnings Witholding Order, Employer Return, Emplyer/Employee Instructions, Writ of Execution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Change of Address Filed- Notice of Change of Address Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Costs After Judgment Filed- Memorandum of Costs After Judgment Filed; Comment: Costs: $0.00 Credit: $0.00 Interest: $ 29.60

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Execution Issued- Writ of Execution Issued; Comment: County: Mariposa Amount: 2690.10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties- Comment: Amended Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of- Authorization to Appear on Behalf of; Comment: Name: Roberto Montejano, Consumer Litigation Specialist

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2017
  • Court Trial- Judicial Officer: Gamoian, Lisa; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2016
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order SC- Comment: Fee: $85.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service- Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2016
  • Cause Of Action- Action Plaintiff's Claim ; File Date: 11/07/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Plaintiff's Claim filed- Plaintiff's Claim filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • Financial info for Wheels Financial Group, LLC: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2017-00006242 Wheels Financial Group, LLC $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • Financial info for Wheels Financial Group, LLC: Transaction Assessment $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2016
  • Financial info for Wheels Financial Group, LLC: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2016-00037142 Wheels Financial Group, LLC $100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2016
  • Financial info for Wheels Financial Group, LLC: Transaction Assessment $100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2016
  • Financial: Wheels Financial Group, LLC; Total Financial Assessment $125.00; Total Payments and Credits $125.00

    Read MoreRead Less